Nautilus Insurance Company v. Patrick J. Lawrence Jr
Plaintiff: Nautilus Insurance Company
Defendant: Patrick J. Lawrence, Jr. doing business as PJ's Construction
Case Number: 1:2024cv00561
Filed: December 20, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Referring Judge: JILL A OTAKE
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2025 Filing 12 EO: Pursuant to the #11 letter request, the Court CONTINUES the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for 02/24/2025 to 03/06/2025 at 9:00 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD.Scheduling Conference Statements are due 02/27/2025. Parties are directed to review Rule 10.3 of the Local Rules of Practice for the United States District Court for the District of Hawaii regarding requirements for Mandatory Chambers Copies. Parties are to participate via telephone through the Courts Zoom Teleconference. Call-in information for this hearing is below. Parties must connect to the conference at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing. Dial in number: 1-833-568-8864 Access Code: 160 8983 1896 (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(jsd)
February 13, 2025 Filing 11 Letter (via email) to Magistrate Judge Kenneth J. Mansfield from Wayne R. Wagner, Esq., dated February 12, 2025, Re: Request to continue the 02/24/2025 Rule 16 Scheduling Conference. (jsd)
February 4, 2025 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nautilus Insurance Company. Patrick J. Lawrence, Jr served on 1/31/2025. (Wagner, Wayne)
December 23, 2024 Filing 9 EO: The parties are directed to review the General Civil Case Procedures Before Judge Otake posted on the court's website and are expected to comply with the most recent version that is posted. (JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE)(shm)
December 20, 2024 Filing 8 Notice to Parties Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements: Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 and Criminal Rule 12.4 both address the filing of Corporate Disclosure Statements. Both rules state A party must:(1) file the Rule 7.1(a) (or 12.4(a)) statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court, and (2) promptly file a supplemental statement upon a change in the information that the statement requires. (eta)
December 20, 2024 Filing 7 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of the Service of Summons)(eta)
December 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 2/24/2025 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 12/20/2024. ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (eta)
December 20, 2024 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Patrick J. Lawrence, Jr., dba PJ's Construction (eta)
December 20, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 24-00561 JAO-KJM on all further pleadings. (eta)
December 20, 2024 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nautilus Insurance Company. (Wagner, Wayne)
December 20, 2024 Filing 2 Summons (Proposed) (Wagner, Wayne)
December 20, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against Patrick J. Lawrence Jr dba PJ's Construction ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AHIDC-3093916.), filed by Nautilus Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wagner, Wayne) Modified on 12/20/2024 (eta).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nautilus Insurance Company v. Patrick J. Lawrence Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nautilus Insurance Company
Represented By: Wayne R. Wagner
Represented By: Deborah Ann DiCristofaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick J. Lawrence, Jr. doing business as PJ's Construction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?