Aviation Finance Group, LLC et al v. Duc Housing Partners, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Aviation Finance Group, LLC, Aviation Securitization, LLC and Wells Fargo Bank National Association
Defendant: Duc Housing Partners, Inc and Daniel A Duc
Case Number: 1:2008cv00535
Filed: December 12, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: Ada - Southern
Presiding Judge: B. Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 12:1725 Collection under Contract Guaranty

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 62 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge Larry M. Boyle. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by dks)
June 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 56 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Larry M. Boyle. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by dks)
April 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 28 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Larry M. Boyle. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by dks)
May 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 5 Motion to Dismiss or transfer; denying 8 Motion to Remand to State Court. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by dks)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aviation Finance Group, LLC et al v. Duc Housing Partners, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aviation Finance Group, LLC
Represented By: Jason D Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aviation Securitization, LLC
Represented By: Jason D Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank National Association
Represented By: Jason D Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duc Housing Partners, Inc
Represented By: Samuel A Diddle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel A Duc
Represented By: Samuel A Diddle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?