Wicklund v. Page et al
Plaintiff: Mark Stephen Wicklund
Defendant: James F Page, Treasure Valley Polygraph, Ascertain Polygraph Services and Idaho Department of Corrections
Case Number: 1:2009cv00671
Filed: December 22, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Office: Boise - Southern Office
County: Ada - Southern
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Lodge
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER ADOPTING 85 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS ; granting 69 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot 79 Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot 83 Motion to Continue. Signed by Judge Edward J. Lodge. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (dks)
August 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 43 Report and Recommendations, granting 35 Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Idaho Department of Corrections. Defendant shall prepare an appropriate form of judgment for entry by the Court and sub mit the same to the Courts proposed orders email box, EJL_Orders@id.uscourts.gov, no later than August 15, 2011. Signed by Judge Edward J. Lodge. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by dks)
July 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS the Report and Recommendation entered on May 25, 2011, (Dkt. 56 ), should be, and is hereby, INCORPORATED by reference and ADOPTED in its entirety. Defendant James F. Page's Motion for Summary Judgment (Dkt. 41 ) is DENIED. Plaintiff Mark S. Wicklund shall file an amended complaint by 8/9/11. The parties may engage in limited discovery in this matter as discussed in the Report and Recommendation until on or before 9/12/11. Any additional dispositive motions shall be filed by 10/12/11. Signed by Judge Edward J. Lodge. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by jm)
June 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting 58 Motion to Compel; granting 59 Motion to Quash. Signed by Judge Candy W Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by klw)
January 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER ADOPTING 32 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS denying 27 Motion to Dismiss, filed by Treasure Valley Polygraph, James F Page, Ascertain Polygraph Services. Signed by Judge Edward J. Lodge. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by dks)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wicklund v. Page et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Stephen Wicklund
Represented By: Jacob Dennis Deaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James F Page
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Treasure Valley Polygraph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ascertain Polygraph Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Idaho Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?