Storm v. Correctional Medical Services P.A.'s A-Z et al
Plaintiff: Rickie Storm
Defendant: Correctional Medical Services P.A.'s A-Z, Doctors A-Z, Jeff Shaman and ISCI Medical Staff
Case Number: 1:2010cv00319
Filed: June 24, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Office: Boise - Southern Office
County: Ada - Southern
Presiding Judge: Ronald E Bush
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 96 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration 92 is DENIED. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
September 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 90 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER. IT IS ORDERED Plaintiff's Motion to Compel 88 is DENIED. Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 78 is GRANTED. Allclaims that have not previously been dismissed are now DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
April 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 41 Motion for Reconsideration; granting 47 Motion for Discovery. Defendants shall produce a complete copy of Plaintiffs medical records within 14 days of the signing of this order. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjm)
September 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 16 Motion to Produce; denying 18 Motion to Appoint Counsel; granting in part and denying in part 20 Motion for Service and Motion for Sanctions; finding as moot 21 Motion to Compel; denying 24 Motion f or Default Judgment; granting 25 Motion to Dismiss; granting 30 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. The Clerk of Court shall send another Waiver of Service of Summons to Defendant Shahan in care of John J Burke. If Shahan, or his attorney, do not return the waiver within 30 days, the Clerk of Court is instructed to provide a Summons and the Complain to the US Marshal Service for personal service on him. Plaintiff may proceed with his Eighth Amendment claims and his medical malpractice claims against CMS and Shahan as they relate to physical therapy. All other claims and all other Defendants are DISMISSED. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by cjm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Storm v. Correctional Medical Services P.A.'s A-Z et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rickie Storm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Medical Services P.A.'s A-Z
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doctors A-Z
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Shaman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ISCI Medical Staff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?