Taylor et al v. Hawley Troxell Ennis & Hawley LLP et al

Plaintiff: Donna Taylor and Dale Miesen
Defendant: Hawley Troxell Ennis & Hawley LLP, Gary Babbitt, Richard Riley, D. John Ashby, Michael Cashman, Sr., James Beck, R. John Taylor, Kent Petersen, CropUSA Insurance Agency, Inc., AIA Services Corporation, AIA Insurance, Inc., Hudson Insurance Group and Growers National Cooperative Insurance Agency
Case Number: 1:2010cv00404
Filed: August 11, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Office: Boise - Southern Office
County: Ada - Southern
Presiding Judge: Larry M. Boyle
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 420 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER - The Court HEREBY ORDERS: 1. Crumb & Mundings Motion for Attorney Fees (Dkt. 399 ) will be considered atthe conclusion of the case. 2. The Courts dismissal of GemCaps Third-Party Complaint remains WITHOUT PREJUDICE. GemCap retains the right to reassert its claims in a separate lawsuit at a later date. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 391 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER - THE COURT HEREBY ORDERS: 1. Crumb & Mundings Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. 303 ) is GRANTED. 2. Crumb & Mundings Motion for Sanctions (Dkt. 362 ) is DENIED. 3. Quarles & Bradys Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. 322 ) is GRANTED. 4. GemCaps Third Party Complaint (Dkt. 288) is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. 5. If GemCap wishes to file an Amended Complaint 288 , it shall seek leave to do so within 30 days of the date of this order and shall submit a copy of the Amended Third Party Complaint with such filing. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
March 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 358 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. The Motion to Disqualify filed by the AIA Controlling Defendants and CropUSA (Dkt. 275 ) is DENIED. 2. The Motion to Disqualify filed by the Hawley Troxell Defendants (Dkt. 278 ) is DENIED. 3 . Roderick Bond may remain in this case as counsel for Dale Miesen. Roderick Bond may not represent Reed Taylor in this case. 4. The Motion to Take Judicial Notice filed by the Hawley Troxell Defendants (Dkt. 344 ) is GRANTED. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 264 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER - NOW THERFORE IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1) Third Party Defendants Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. 252 ) is DENIED; and 2) Third Party Defendants Motion for a More Definite Statement (Dkt. 252 ) is DENIED. A responsive pleading to the Third Party Complaint must be filed within 14 days of notice of this Order. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 263 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER (DKT. 241 ; DKT. 220 ) - NOW THERFORE IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1) Defendants Motion to Dismiss is DENIED in part and GRANTED in part; 2) Plaintiffs Motion for Relief is DENIED. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
October 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 178 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying as moot 138 Hawley Troxell Defendants Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 139 Plaintiffs Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss Donna Taylor; granting 141 GemCap Lending I, LLCs Motion to Interv ene and Seal; denying 169 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike. The Clerk of the Court is directed to seal the Settlement Agreement located at Docket No. 128 , pages 21 through 48, until further order of the Court. Plaintiffs deadline to file a motio n to amend pleadings or join parties is 11/4/2016. A telephonic scheduling and status conference is set for 11/30/2016 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
December 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 AMENDED ORDER re 30 Order,. Signed by Judge Larry M. Boyle. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by krb)
November 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER of Dismissal with Prejudice of Growers National Cooperative Insurance Agency re 21 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Growers National Cooperative Insurance Agency. Signed by Judge Larry M. Boyle. (krb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor et al v. Hawley Troxell Ennis & Hawley LLP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Taylor
Represented By: Lee H Rousso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale Miesen
Represented By: Lee H Rousso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hawley Troxell Ennis & Hawley LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Babbitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. John Ashby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Cashman, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. John Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kent Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CropUSA Insurance Agency, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIA Services Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIA Insurance, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hudson Insurance Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Growers National Cooperative Insurance Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?