Asarco LLC v. Union Pacific Railroad Company et al

Plaintiff: Asarco LLC
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company and Union Pacific Corporation
Case Number: 1:2012cv00283
Filed: June 5, 2012
Court: Idaho District Court
Office: CDA - Northern Office
County: Ada - Southern
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Lodge
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:1365 Environmental Matters
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 30, 2016 218 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER - it is HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. Defendants Motion to Compel Discovery Responses and to Deem Requests for Admission Admitted (Docket No. 127 ) is GRANTED, in part, and DENIED, in part. 2. Union Pacific Railroad Companys Objection to, and Motion to Strike or Exclude, Asarcos Untimely Filings (Docket No. 160 ) is GRANTED, in part, and DENIED, in part asfollows: a. Docket Nos. 152-157 are not stricken; in this respect, Union Pacifics Motion is DENIED; and b. Docket No . 158 is stricken; in this respect, Union Pacifics Motion is GRANTED. Correspondingly, Docket Nos. 174 and 182 (and related materials) are likewise stricken. 3. Asarcos Motion to Extend Time for Filing Documents in Support of Asarco LLCs Respon se in Opposition to Union Pacific Railroad Companys Motion for Summary Judgment (Docket No. 176 ) is GRANTED. 4. Asarco LLCs Motion to Strike and Objection to Improper Briefing (Docket No. 178 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
May 2, 2016 206 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER RE: UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANYS MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER (Docket No. 95), UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANYS MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER UNDER FRCP 26(b)(2)(C) AND 26(c)(1) (Docket No. 108) granting in part and denying in part 95 Motion for Protective Order; denying 108 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
September 9, 2015 113 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 86 Motion to Disqualify. Signed by Judge Edward J. Lodge. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
March 28, 2013 50 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER finding as moot 44 Motion to Strike ; granting 31 Motion to Dismiss. NOW THEREFORE IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. 31) is GRANTED. This case is HEREBY DISMISSED IN ITS ENTIRETY. Signed by Judge Edward J. Lodge. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Asarco LLC v. Union Pacific Railroad Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Asarco LLC
Represented By: Gregory Evans
Represented By: Jeffrey C Fereday
Represented By: Steven G Jones
Represented By: Linda R Larson
Represented By: Michael Philip Lawrence
Represented By: William R Pletcher
Represented By: Russell C Prugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Represented By: Robert W Lawrence
Represented By: Carolyn L McIntosh
Represented By: Ausey H Robnett, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Corporation
Represented By: Robert W Lawrence
Represented By: Carolyn L McIntosh
Represented By: Ausey H Robnett, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?