Dunn v. Hatch et al

Plaintiff: Eli Dunn
Defendant: Bryce Hatch, Hatch Marine Enterprise, LLC and F/V Silver Bullet
Case Number: 1:2015cv00479
Filed: October 9, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Office: Boise - Southern Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: B. Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:1101
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 116 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, that the plaintiff receive from defendant the sum of $5,025.25 as attorney fees and costs as a sanction for the bad faith conduct of defendant in submitting a forgery to the Court. IT IS FURTH ER ORDERED, that the motion for attorney's fees generally (dockt no. 112 ) be GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. It is granted to the extent it seeks, $5,000 in attorney fees as a sanction for the bad faith conduct in hiding during discovery a sum of money received. It is denied in all other aspects. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (km)
January 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 110 FINDINGS OF FACT & CONCLUSIONS OF LAW & ORDER. NOW THEREFORE IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, that Plaintiff Allen's claims are dismissed. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, that Plaintiff Dunn is awarded additional wages in the sum of $1,905.45, the costs of the handwriting expert Hannah McFarland, and The attorney fees Dunn incurred for his attorney's time in preparing for and taking the deposition of McFarland. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, that plaintiffs' counsel shall file within 30 days from the date of this decision any motion for attorney fees and an affidavit detailing the amount of costs and fees awarded here. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 102 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 71 Motion for Entry of Judgment; 86 Motion in Limine, and 89 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 91 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 78 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER. NOW THEREFORE IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, that the motion to dismiss and to strike 67 is GRANTED and that the fraud claim contained in paragraph 10 of the Amended Complaint (docket no. 65) is stricken; the reference to pe rsonal liability of defendant Bryce Hatch in 2 is stricken; and the reference to punitivedamages in 4, 5 & 8 is stricken. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
August 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 49 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 50 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 57 Motion to Strike; granting 60 Motion for Dsicovery; granting 62 Motio n to Strike. Plaintiffs shall amend their fraud claim to comply with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 9(b) within 30 days from the date of this decision or have the claim dismissed without further notice. The plaintiffs shall be granted 30 days to do discovery limited to (1) the purchase price paid by Leader Creek Fisheries for the catch at issue here, and (2) whether Leader Creek Fisheries paid to Hatch any adjustment concerning the salmon catch at issue here. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dunn v. Hatch et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eli Dunn
Represented By: John W Merriam
Represented By: Jonathan M Volyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryce Hatch
Represented By: Stephen Christopher Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hatch Marine Enterprise, LLC
Represented By: Stephen Christopher Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F/V Silver Bullet
Represented By: Stephen Christopher Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?