Bettwieser v. Gans et al
Plaintiff: Martin Bettwieser
Defendant: Billy Gans, Kelly Kalbfleisch, Herschal Howard and United States Postal Service
Case Number: 1:2015cv00493
Filed: October 20, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Office: Boise - Southern Office
County: Ada - Southern
Presiding Judge: Ronald E. Bush
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER. NOW THEREFORE IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the report and Recommendation entered on February 1, 2017 is ADOPTED IN PART AND REJECTED IN PART. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 22 is GRANTED and Plaintiffs Complaint is dismissed in its entirety. Signed by Judge Edward J. Lodge. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
February 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER RE: PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ADDITIONALFINDINGS/RULINGS - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion for Additional Findings/Rulings (Docket No. 36 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
August 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - NOW THEREFORE IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Report and Recommendation entered on 5/2/2016 (Dkt. 27 ) is ADOPTED IN ITS ENTIRETY. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. 9 ) is GRANTED and the Complaint is DISMISSED as to ALL CLAIMS against HerschelHoward. Signed by Judge Edward J. Lodge. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs) Modified on 9/1/2016 to correct filing date (cjs).
August 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER RE: PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO RECONSIDER (Docket No. 28 ) - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion to Reconsider (Docket No. 28 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
May 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER RE: PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO STRIKE - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion to Strike (Docket No. 16 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bettwieser v. Gans et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Bettwieser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Billy Gans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Kalbfleisch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herschal Howard
Represented By: Marty Durand
Represented By: Mark Robert Gisler
Represented By: James Marshall Piotrowski
Represented By: Joshua B Scharff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Postal Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?