McDaniel v. Dietrich School District No. 314 et al

Plaintiff: Antwon McDaniel
Defendant: Dietrich School District No. 314, Stephanie Shaw, Benjamin Hardcastle, Benjamin Hoskisson, Wayne Dill, Star Olsen, Kris Hubert, Perry Van Tassell, Bret Peterson, Michael Torgerson, Rick Astle, Brad Dotson and John & Jane Does 1-10
Case Number: 1:2016cv00202
Filed: May 13, 2016
Court: Idaho District Court
Office: Boise - Southern Office
County: Lincoln - Southern
Presiding Judge: B. Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 28, 2017 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - NOW THEREFORE IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, that the Petition to Approve Incompetent Plaintiffs Settlement (docket no. 91 ) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, that attorneys for the Plaintiff shall file within 20 days from and after the docketing of this Order, their respective petitions and affidavits requesting allowance of attorneys fees and costs, if any. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, that the guardian ad litem shall file his affidavit and report to this court within 10 days following the filing o f requests for fees and costs, stating his approval, disapproval and recommendations regarding allowance of the fee and cost applications so filed by any and all counsel. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, that within 10 days after the docketing of the Order abo ve described, attorneys for plaintiff shall file with the court the proposed Judgment and Order providing for Dismissal with Prejudice of this action. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
May 15, 2017 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPOINTING GUARDIAN AD LITEM granting 26 Motion to Appoint Guardian Ad Litem. Timothy McDaniel is appointed as Guardian Ad Litem pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 17(c)(1)(A). Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
March 6, 2017 43 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER - NOW THEREFORE IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, that the motion to quash (docket no. 34 ) is DENIED. The IDHW shall provide, within ten days from the date of this decision, two copies of the McDaniel family file materials to the Clerks Office of the Court (to the attention of Law Clerk David Metcalf), and the Court will distribute the two copies to counsel. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, that defendants shall provide to the Court for signature a clean copy of the Proposed Protective Order at Exhibit D (Dkt. No. 39 -1). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, that the motion for guardian ad litem (docket no. 26 ) is RESERVED pending a future hearing. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, that a hearing shall be held on the motion for guardian ad litem (docke t no. 26) on 5/9/2017, at 3:00 p.m. in the Federal Courthouse in Boise Idaho. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, that the motion for Rule 35 examination (docket no. 33 ) is GRANTED pursuant to the five agreements listed above. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
November 3, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER - Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
October 28, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 14 Motion for Disclosure; granting 15 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McDaniel v. Dietrich School District No. 314 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antwon McDaniel
Represented By: R Keith Roark
Represented By: E Lee Schlender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dietrich School District No. 314
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Shaw
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin Hardcastle
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin Hoskisson
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Dill
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Star Olsen
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kris Hubert
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perry Van Tassell
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bret Peterson
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Torgerson
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Astle
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Dotson
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John & Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?