Falk v. HP Inc.
Plaintiff: Kevin Falk
Defendant: HP Inc.
Case Number: 1:2017cv00401
Filed: September 27, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Office: Boise - Southern Office
County: Ada - Southern
Presiding Judge: B. Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 29:623
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER - Pursuant to an agreement between the Parties, docket entries 41 , 55 and 56 are hereby DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the deadlines in this case are stayed. The parties are instructed to file with the Court a joint notice on or before September 24, 2018 regarding (1) the parties progress in resolving this case through alternative di spute resolution and (2) the parties progress inresolving the discovery disputes described in Plaintiffs Motion Regarding Discovery Issues (Dkt. 56 ) and Defendants Motion to Compel and Motion for Protective Order (Dkt. 55 ). (Status Report due by 9/24/2018.) Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 SUPPLEMENTAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER RE: DISCOVERY DISPUTES TRACK: (Standard) re 25 Case Management Order - Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 37 MOTION to Compel Discovery. (Status Report due by 8/10/2018.) Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: 1. Plaintiffs Motion to Amend (Dkt. 14 ) is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file his First Amended Complaint as soon as reasonably practicable, and within five (5) days of this Order being entered. Defendant s hall file an Answer to the First Amended Complaint within 14 days of it being filed. 2. Defendants Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. 9 ) and Motion to Strike (Dkt. 10 ) are DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Falk v. HP Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Falk
Represented By: Erika Birch
Represented By: Thomas Guy Hallam, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HP Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?