C. v. Blue Cross of Idaho Health Service

Plaintiff: Jacob C.
Defendant: Blue Cross of Idaho Health Service and Blue Cross Blue Shield of Idaho
Case Number: 1:2018cv00300
Filed: July 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Office: Boise - Southern Office
County: Ada - Southern
Presiding Judge: Ronald E Bush
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2018 Filing 16 Summons Issued as to Blue Cross of Idaho Health Service. (Print attached Summons for service.) (st)
September 5, 2018 Filing 15 ERRATA by Plaintiff Jacob C. re #13 Amended Complaint correcting caption and case number. (King, Brian)
September 4, 2018 Filing 14 STATUS REPORT by Jacob C.. (King, Brian)
September 4, 2018 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT (SECOND) against Blue Cross Blue Shield of Idaho, filed by Jacob C..(King, Brian)
September 4, 2018 Filing 12 DOCKET TEXT NOTICE: Plaintiff's counsel shall comply with L.R. 4.1 forthwith. (lc)
August 14, 2018 Filing 11 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #10 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Brian Smith King for Jacob C. Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
August 8, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Brian S. King. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1770358.)Erika Birch appearing for Plaintiff Jacob C.. Responses due by 8/29/2018 (Birch, Erika)
August 8, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Erika Birch on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Birch, Erika)
July 16, 2018 All out of state counsel continuing representation need to obtain local counsel and file an Application for Pro Hac Vice. Please see Local Rule, Civil Rule 83.4 Bar Admission e) Pro Hac Vice/Local Counsel and ECF Procedures 3. Registration, Logins and Passwords. B. Limited Registered Participants.1. (cjs)
July 16, 2018 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of Utah; Case Number 2:17-cv-00750. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Change Venue. It is ORDERED that this matter shall be transferred to the United States District Court for the District of Idaho. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 7/12/2018. (jds)
July 11, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Plaintiff Jacob C.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Brooke C. Wells.(King, Brian)
August 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 8/11/17. (jlw)
August 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CIVIL STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 8/10/17. (ss)
August 9, 2017 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Blue Cross Blue Shield of Idaho. New Defendants: Blue Cross of Idaho Health Service, Inc. dba Blue Cross of Idaho. Removed Defendants: Blue Cross Blue Shield of Idaho. filed by Jacob C.. (King, Brian)
July 6, 2017 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Blue Cross Blue Shield of Idaho (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-2792173) filed by Jacob C.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet civil cover sheet) Assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish (King, Brian)
July 6, 2017 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish. Plaintiff Jacob C. is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: C. v. Blue Cross of Idaho Health Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross of Idaho Health Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross Blue Shield of Idaho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob C.
Represented By: Brian S King
Represented By: Erika Birch
Represented By: Brian Smith King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?