Eastop v. Bennion et al
Plaintiff: Craig Eastop
Defendant: GwenCarol Holmes, Kevin Garrison, Kelly Green, Ellen Mandeville, Shawn Bennion and Rob Clayton
Case Number: 1:2018cv00342
Filed: August 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Office: Boise - Southern Office
County: Blaine - Southern
Presiding Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Shawn Bennion.(Gardner, David)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - Case Management deadline set for 10/10/2018 for the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 10/17/2018 02:00 PM in Boise Chambers before Judge B. Lynn Winmill. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
August 27, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Shawn Bennion, Rob Clayton, Craig Eastop, Kevin Garrison, Kelly Green, GwenCarol Holmes, Ellen Mandeville re #1 Complaint, #4 Notice of Appearance Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 10/26/2018. (cjs)
August 27, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by David Paul Gardner on behalf of All Defendants (Gardner, David)
August 15, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Craig Eastop. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service Clayton, #2 Affidavit of Service Green, #3 Affidavit of Service Mandeville, #4 Affidavit of Service Garrison, #5 Affidavit of Service Holmes)(Piotrowski, James)
August 2, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Shawn Bennion, Rob Clayton, Kevin Garrison, Kelly Green, GwenCarol Holmes, Ellen Mandeville. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons Rob Clayton, #2 Summons Kelly Green, #3 Summons Ellen Mandeville, #4 Summons Kevin Garrison, #5 Summons GwenCarol Holmes)(cjs)
August 2, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1768251.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Bennion, #3 Summons Clayton, #4 Summons Green, #5 Summons Mandeville, #6 Summons Garrison, #7 Summons Holmes)(Durand, Marty)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eastop v. Bennion et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GwenCarol Holmes
Represented By: David Paul Gardner
Represented By: Jetta Hatch Mathews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Garrison
Represented By: David Paul Gardner
Represented By: Jetta Hatch Mathews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Green
Represented By: David Paul Gardner
Represented By: Jetta Hatch Mathews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ellen Mandeville
Represented By: David Paul Gardner
Represented By: Jetta Hatch Mathews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Bennion
Represented By: David Paul Gardner
Represented By: Jetta Hatch Mathews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rob Clayton
Represented By: David Paul Gardner
Represented By: Jetta Hatch Mathews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Eastop
Represented By: Paul J Stark
Represented By: James Marshall Piotrowski
Represented By: Marty Durand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?