Passons v. Christensen
Petitioner: Russell Allen Passons
Respondent: Jay Christensen
Case Number: 1:2018cv00344
Filed: August 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Office: Boise - Southern Office
County: Ada - Southern
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2018 Filing 5 Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account, This is a sealed document. re #4 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Russell Allen Passons. (cjs)
August 27, 2018 Filing 4 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Russell Allen Passons. Responses due by 9/17/2018 (cjs)
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER of Conditional Filing - (cjs) Modified on 8/9/2018 to reflect mailed to Petitioner on 8/10/2018 (cjs).
August 3, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION to Take Judicial Notice by Petitioner Russell Allen Passons. Responses due by 8/24/2018 (cjs)
August 3, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Russell Allen Passons. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit part 1 of 2, #2 Exhibit part 2 of 2, #3 Cover Letter)(cjs)(Conformed copy returned to Petitioner on 8/10/2018.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Passons v. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jay Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Russell Allen Passons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?