Morrison v. CNCPros International, Inc.

Plaintiff: Dean Morrison
Defendant: CNCPros International, Inc. and Brian S. Denny
Case Number: 1:2018cv00357
Filed: August 14, 2018
Court: Idaho District Court
Office: Boise - Southern Office
County: Ada - Southern
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 24, 2018 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by CNCPros International, Inc., Brian S. Denny.(Ashby, D.)
August 22, 2018 8 AMENDED DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Hearing: Per the request of counsel in this matter, the Telephonic Scheduling Conference currently set for 10/22/2018 10:00 AM is hereby VACATED and RE-SET for 10/30/2018 10:00 AM Telephonic Hearing - Boise Courtroom 6 before Judge Candy W. Dale. Counsel for Plaintiff to initiate the conference call and when all parties are on the line, connect to the courtroom at 208-334-9945. Stipulated Litigation and Discovery Plans to be filed on or before 10/23/2018. (at)
August 21, 2018 7 Featured Case LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 10/22/2018 10:00 AM in Telephonic Hearing - Boise Courtroom 6 before Judge Candy W. Dale. On or before 10/15/18, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
August 17, 2018 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dean Morrison. CNCPros International, Inc. served on 8/14/2017, answer due 9/4/2017. (Thomas, William)
August 17, 2018 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dean Morrison. Brian S. Denny served on 8/14/2018, answer due 9/4/2018. (Thomas, William)
August 17, 2018 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - The entry docket number #4 Affidavit of Service filed by Dean Morrison, #3 Affidavit of Service filed by Dean Morrison were filed incorrectly in this case as the wrong event was used. The filing party shall re-submit their filings using the correct event of "Summons Returned Executed" located under Service of Process. Using this event will prompt for entry of the service date and then set the answer deadline in ECF.(cjs)
August 17, 2018 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, Summons and Civil Cover served on CNCPros International, Inc. on 8/14/18, filed by Dean Morrison. (Thomas, William)
August 17, 2018 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, Summons and Civil Cover served on Brian S. Denny on 8/14/18, filed by Dean Morrison. (Thomas, William)
August 14, 2018 2 Summons Issued as to CNCPros International, Inc., Brian S. Denny. (Print attached Summons for service.) (cjs)
August 14, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against CNCPros International, Inc., Brian S. Denny ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1772388.), filed by Dean Morrison. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Thomas, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morrison v. CNCPros International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dean Morrison
Represented By: William H Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CNCPros International, Inc.
Represented By: D. John Ashby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian S. Denny
Represented By: D. John Ashby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?