Wiser v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Mary Lou Wiser
Defendant: United States Postal Service, United States of America and Unites States Postal Service
Case Number: 1:2018cv00363
Filed: August 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Office: Boise - Southern Office
County: Ada - Southern
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2018 Filing 6 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FORM - LITIGATION PLAN by United States of America, Unites States Postal Service. (Rodriguez, Joanne)
October 15, 2018 Filing 5 DISCOVERY PLAN by United States of America, Unites States Postal Service Joint Discovery Plan. (Rodriguez, Joanne)
September 6, 2018 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - The entry docket number #4 Summons Returned Executed filed by Mary Lou Wiser was filed incorrectly in this case as the wrong event was used. The correct event is "Summons Returned Executed as to USA" located under Service of Process as the response time for an answer is different for the USA.No action is needed by the filing party as the Clerk's Office will edit the entry and reset the answer deadline to 10/23/2018.(cjs)
September 6, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mary Lou Wiser. Unites States Postal Service served on 8/24/2018, answer due 10/23/2018. (Starnes, Nathan) Modified on 9/6/2018 to correct answer deadline pursuant to Corrective Entry (cjs).
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - Case Management deadline set for 10/15/2018 for the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 10/22/2018 10:30 AM in Boise - Courtroom 6 before Judge Candy W. Dale. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
August 20, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to United States of America, Unites States Postal Service, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Print attached Summons for service.) (cjs)
August 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mary Lou Wiser ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1774575.), filed by Mary Lou Wiser. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Cover Sheet)(Starnes, Nathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wiser v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Lou Wiser
Represented By: Nathan R. Starnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Postal Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unites States Postal Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?