Treasure Valley Factors, LLC v. Gathright et al
Plaintiff: Treasure Valley Factors, LLC
Defendant: Jared Gathright, Brittney W. Gathright, Xpress Preservation and Xpress Preservation LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00372
Filed: August 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2018 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - The entry docket number #10 MOTION for Default Judgment filed by Treasure Valley Factors, LLC was filed incorrectly in this case as the wrong Motion event was used. The correct Motion event is "Entry of Default". The Clerks Office will edit the entry so the filing party DOES NOT need to re-submit their filing.CORRECTIVE ENTRY - The entry in regards to the proposed order, was filed incorrectly in this case. Pursuant to the ECF Procedures, section 12B, all proposed orders are to be submitted by email to the appropriate Judges proposed order email box (even Clerk's entry of default). The filing party shall re-submit their proposed order.(cjs)
September 26, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Michael Moscrip appearing for Plaintiff Treasure Valley Factors, LLC. Responses due by 10/17/2018 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support, #2 Appendix Proposed Clerk's Entry of Default, #3 Supplement Certificate of Service)(Moscrip, Michael) Modified on 9/26/2018 pursuant to Corrective Entry (cjs).
September 25, 2018 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Jared Gathright.(cjs)
September 7, 2018 Filing 9 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Treasure Valley Factors, LLC. Amendment to #8 Summons Returned Executed 09/03/2018. (Moscrip, Michael)
September 7, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Treasure Valley Factors, LLC. Xpress Preservation served on 9/3/2018, answer due 9/24/2018. (Moscrip, Michael) Modified on 9/7/2018 to refer to Dkt. #9 for correct document (cjs).
September 7, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Treasure Valley Factors, LLC. Xpress Preservation LLC served on 9/3/2018, answer due 9/24/2018. (Moscrip, Michael)
September 7, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Treasure Valley Factors, LLC. Jared Gathright served on 9/3/2018, answer due 9/24/2018. (Moscrip, Michael)
September 7, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Treasure Valley Factors, LLC. Brittney W. Gathright served on 9/3/2018, answer due 9/24/2018. (Moscrip, Michael)
August 24, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Brittney W. Gathright, Jared Gathright, Xpress Preservation, Xpress Preservation LLC. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons Jared Gathright, #2 Summons Xpress Preservation, #3 Summons Xpress Preservation LLC)(cjs)
August 24, 2018 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet re Corrective Entry,. (Moscrip, Michael)
August 23, 2018 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - The entry docket number #1 Complaint, filed by Treasure Valley Factors, LLC was filed incorrectly in this case as the required Civil Cover Sheet is missing. The form is available on our website. The filing party shall submit their form using the event of "Civil Cover Sheet" located under Other Documents.(cjs)
August 23, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Treasure Valley Factors, LLC. (Moscrip, Michael)
August 23, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Treasure Valley Factors, LLC against Brittney W. Gathright, Jared Gathright, Xpress Preservation, Xpress Preservation LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1777039.), filed by Treasure Valley Factors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons for Brittney W. Guthright, #2 Summons for Jared Guthright, #3 Summons for Xpress Preservation, LLC, #4 Summons for Xpress preservation, #5 Exhibit Application with Treasure Valley Factors, LLC, #6 Supplement Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Moscrip, Michael) Modified on 8/23/2018 (cjs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Treasure Valley Factors, LLC v. Gathright et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jared Gathright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brittney W. Gathright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xpress Preservation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xpress Preservation LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Treasure Valley Factors, LLC
Represented By: Michael Moscrip
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?