Canter v. Harms Pacific Transport, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Jamie P. Canter
Defendant: James Elgin and Harms Pacific Transport, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00386
Filed: August 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Ronald E Bush
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - Amended Pleadings/Joinder of Parties due by 1/21/2019. Completion of Fact Discovery due by 4/1/2019. ADR (Mediation or Settlement conference) shall take place by 12/14/2018. Dispositive Motions due by 4/22/2019. Telephonic Status Conference set for 2/11/2019 02:30 PM in Boise - Courtroom 7 before Judge Ronald E. Bush. Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
October 22, 2018 Filing 13 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #10 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Emily R Rankin for Jamie P. Canter Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (km)
October 19, 2018 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by James Elgin, Harms Pacific Transport, Inc..(Riseborough, John)
October 16, 2018 Filing 11 DISCOVERY PLAN by Jamie P. Canter Joint. (Lutz, Michael)
October 16, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Emily R. Rankin. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1799273.)Michael Finton Lutz appearing for Plaintiff Jamie P. Canter. Responses due by 11/6/2018 (Lutz, Michael) (Main Document 10 replaced on 10/22/2018 with PDF that can't be edited) (km).
September 24, 2018 Filing 9 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FORM - LITIGATION PLAN by Jamie P. Canter. (Lutz, Michael)
September 13, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Jamie P. Canter, James Elgin, Harms Pacific Transport, Inc. re #1 Complaint, #3 Notice of Appearance Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 11/12/2018. (cjs)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Unless the Plaintiff contacts the Courtroom Deputy, Lynette Case, and requests a different date and time, the Court will conduct a telephonic scheduling conference on OCTOBER 23, 2018, 10:00 A.M. *Mountain time, for purpose of confirming the deadlines proposed by the parties in the JOINT Litigation Plan. Plaintiff must initiate the conference call by placing it to (208) 334-1495 and must have allappropriate parties on the line. Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (km)
September 11, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jamie P. Canter. Harms Pacific Transport, Inc. served on 9/7/2018, answer due 9/28/2018. (Lutz, Michael)
September 11, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jamie P. Canter. James Elgin served on 9/6/2018, answer due 9/27/2018. (Lutz, Michael)
September 10, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Harms Pacific Transport, Inc.. (Riseborough, John)
September 10, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by John C Riseborough on behalf of All Defendants (Riseborough, John)
August 31, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to James Elgin, Harms Pacific Transport, Inc.. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons Harm Pacific Transport) (km)
August 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Harms Pacific Transport, Inc., and James Elgin. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1780368.), filed by Jamie P. Canter. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons James Elgin , #3 Summons Harms Pacific Transport, Inc. )(Lutz, Michael) Modified on 8/30/2018 to edit text (jp).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Canter v. Harms Pacific Transport, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Elgin
Represented By: John C Riseborough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harms Pacific Transport, Inc.
Represented By: John C Riseborough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie P. Canter
Represented By: Michael F. Lutz
Represented By: Michael Finton Lutz
Represented By: Emily R Rankin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?