Bradford et al v. Bank of Eastern Oregon
Plaintiff: Ryan Clifford Bradford and Judy Kay Bradford
Defendant: Bank of Eastern Oregon
Case Number: 1:2018cv00397
Filed: September 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 28:157
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2018 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Change Venue (Supplemental Response) filed by Bank of Eastern Oregon. Replies due by 11/19/2018.(Hart, Trevor)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER granting #9 unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply. The Court retroactively grants this motion. The reply is due October 26, 2018. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (mls)
October 26, 2018 Filing 10 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Judy Kay Bradford, Ryan Clifford Bradford.(Clark, D)
October 24, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion George W. Breitsameter appearing for Plaintiffs Judy Kay Bradford, Ryan Clifford Bradford. Responses due by 11/14/2018 (Breitsameter, George)
October 10, 2018 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Bank of Eastern Oregon. Replies due by 10/24/2018.(Hart, Trevor)
October 9, 2018 Filing 7 REPLY to Response to Motion re #1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference filed by Judy Kay Bradford, Ryan Clifford Bradford.(Breitsameter, George)
October 3, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE by Judy Kay Bradford, Ryan Clifford Bradford (Breitsameter, George)
October 3, 2018 Filing 5 RESPONSE to Motion re #1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference (Supplemental Response) filed by Bank of Eastern Oregon. Replies due by 10/17/2018.(Hart, Trevor)
September 19, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Change Venue George W. Breitsameter appearing for Plaintiffs Judy Kay Bradford, Ryan Clifford Bradford. Responses due by 10/10/2018 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memo in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue)(Breitsameter, George)
September 19, 2018 Filing 3 REPLY to Response to Motion re #1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference filed by Judy Kay Bradford, Ryan Clifford Bradford.(Breitsameter, George)
September 7, 2018 Filing 2 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference filed by Bank of Eastern Oregon. Replies due by 9/21/2018.(cjs)
September 7, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference, D Blair Clark, George W. Breitsameter, William A Morrow appearing for Plaintiffs Judy Kay Bradford, Ryan Clifford Bradford. (Initially filed in Bankruptcy Court 8/17/2018. Motion Filing fee $181 paid in Bankruptcy Court. Receipt # 6792992.) (Attachments: #1 Adversary Docket Sheet, #2 Bankruptcy Docket Sheet)(cjs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bradford et al v. Bank of Eastern Oregon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of Eastern Oregon
Represented By: Trevor L Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Clifford Bradford
Represented By: William A Morrow
Represented By: D Blair Clark
Represented By: George W. Breitsameter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Kay Bradford
Represented By: William A Morrow
Represented By: D Blair Clark
Represented By: George W. Breitsameter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?