International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Local 291 v. Quality Electric, Inc.

Plaintiff: International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Local 291
Defendant: Quality Electric, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00400
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Ronald E Bush
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - Case Management deadline set for 11/27/2018 for the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 12/4/2018 11:30 AM in Boise - Courtroom 7 before Judge Ronald E. Bush. Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
October 15, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Local 291. Quality Electric, Inc. served on 10/9/2018, answer due 10/30/2018. (Piotrowski, James)
September 19, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Quality Electric, Inc. (Print attached Summons for service.) (st)
September 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF COLLECTIVE BARGAINING AGREEMENT against Quality Electric, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1786148.), filed by International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Local 291. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Cover Sheet, #6 Summons)(Piotrowski, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Local 291 v. Quality Electric, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Electric, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Local 291
Represented By: James Marshall Piotrowski
Represented By: Marty Durand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?