Idaho Conservation League v. Tippets et al
Plaintiff: Idaho Conservation League
Defendant: David Groeschl and John Tippets
Case Number: 1:2018cv00403
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Lodge
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:1319
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE by Idaho Conservation League re #8 Settlement Agreement Notice That 45-Day Review Ends on Nov. 23 (Hurlbutt, Bryan)
October 2, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE by Idaho Conservation League re #8 Settlement Agreement (Hurlbutt, Bryan)
October 1, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE by Idaho Conservation League re #8 Settlement Agreement Notice of 45-day Period (Hurlbutt, Bryan)
October 1, 2018 Filing 8 SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT (Sealed) and Stipulation of Dismissal by Idaho Conservation League. (Hurlbutt, Bryan) Modified on 10/17/2018 to unseal pursuant to Notice Dkt. #10 (cjs).
September 26, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for David Groeschl, Idaho Conservation League, John Tippets re #5 Notice of Appearance, #1 Complaint, #4 Notice of Appearance Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 11/26/2018. (cjs)
September 25, 2018 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Idaho Conservation League. (Hurlbutt, Bryan)
September 25, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa J O'Hara on behalf of John Tippets (O'Hara, Lisa)
September 25, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven W Strack on behalf of David Groeschl (Strack, Steven)
September 17, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to David Groeschl, John Tippets. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued - David Groeschl)(cjs)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - Case Management deadline set for 11/21/2018 for joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 11/30/2018 10:00 AM in Boise Chambers before Judge Edward J. Lodge. Signed by Judge Edward J. Lodge. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
September 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1786293.), filed by Idaho Conservation League. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Hurlbutt, Bryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Idaho Conservation League v. Tippets et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Groeschl
Represented By: Steven W Strack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Tippets
Represented By: Lisa J O'Hara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Idaho Conservation League
Represented By: Bryan Jack Hurlbutt
Represented By: Laurence J Lucas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?