Cadue v. Christensen
Petitioner: Perry W Cadue
Respondent: Jay Christensen
Case Number: 1:2018cv00414
Filed: September 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Ronald E Bush
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Change of Address by Perry W Cadue (cjs)
October 12, 2018 Filing 8 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (cjs)
October 12, 2018 Filing 7 Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account, This is a sealed document. re #2 Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account, #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Perry W Cadue. (Attachments: #1 Duplicate Copy of IFP filed at Dkt. 1)(cjs)
October 2, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Perry W Cadue, Jay Christensen re #3 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 12/3/2018. (cjs)
October 2, 2018 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - The entry docket number 5 Notice of Availability Setting Deadline was filed incorrectly in this case due to Clerk error. Disregard the entry.(cjs)
October 2, 2018 Filing 5 DISREGARD - NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Perry W Cadue, Jay Christensen re #3 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 12/3/2018. (cjs) Modified on 10/2/2018 (cjs).
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER of Conditional Filing - (cjs)
September 28, 2018 Filing 3 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Perry W Cadue. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A part 1 of 2, #2 Exhibit A part 2 of 2, #3 Exhibit B)(cjs)
September 28, 2018 Filing 2 Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account, This is a sealed document. re #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Perry W Cadue. (cjs)
September 28, 2018 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Perry W Cadue. Responses due by 10/19/2018 (cjs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cadue v. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Perry W Cadue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jay Christensen
Represented By: L LaMont Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?