Vinci v. Regence Blue Shield of Idaho, Inc.

Plaintiff: Paul Vinci
Defendant: Regence Blue Shield of Idaho, Inc. and John and Jane Does I-X
Case Number: 1:2018cv00418
Filed: October 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Ronald E Bush
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2018 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Per Dkt 10 Counsel shall file their stipulated lit/discovery plans as outlined in DOC.6, on or before DECEMBER 3, 2018: Case mgmt ddl deadline set for 12/3/2018. (jp)
November 6, 2018 Filing 10 DOCKET TEXT AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing: At the request of counsel, the 11/8/18 hearing is vacated and reset. The Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 12/11/2018 10:30 AM (Mtn.)in Telephonic Hearing - Boise Courtroom 7 before Judge Ronald E. Bush. * Counsel shall file their stipulated lit/discovery plans as outlined in DOC.6, on or before DECEMBER 3, 2018. Mr. Giles shall initiate the call, connecting the Court at 208-334-1495.(lc)
November 5, 2018 Filing 9 DOCKET TEXT NOTICE: Litigation and Discovery Plans were Due 10/31/18. Please refer to DOC. 6. Please file forthwith. (lc)
October 24, 2018 Filing 8 ALL PARTIES HAVE CONSENTED TO PROCEED BEFORE A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE (Attachments: #1 Consent by Plaintiff)(cjs)
October 17, 2018 Filing 7 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (jp)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 11/8/2018 09:30 AM in Telephonic Hearing - Boise Courtroom 7 before Judge Ronald E. Bush. On or before OCTOBER 31, 2018, the parties must file with the Court the JOINT Litigation Plan and Discovery Plans. Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
October 9, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Regence Blue Shield of Idaho, Inc..(Smith, William)
October 9, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Regence Blue Shield of Idaho, Inc.. (Smith, William)
October 5, 2018 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet re #1 Notice of Removal filed by Regence Blue Shield of Idaho, Inc.. (Smith, William)
October 5, 2018 NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (st)
October 5, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Regence Blue Shield of Idaho, Inc. and Paul Vinci re #1 Notice of Removal. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 12/4/2018. (st)
October 5, 2018 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - Docket number #1 Notice of Removal filed by Regence Blue Shield of Idaho, Inc. should have the civil cover sheet as an attachment. The filing party shall file their civil cover sheet using the event Civil Cover Sheet located under civil events, other filings, other documents. (st)
October 1, 2018 RETURN OF SERVICE/PROCESS ASSUMED EXECUTED - Regence Blue Shield of Idaho, Inc. served on 10/1/2018. (service assumed for internal reporting purpose only) (st)
October 1, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Regence Blue Shield of Idaho, Inc. from 4th District of Idaho, Ada County, case number CV01-18-15982.(Filing fee $400 receipt number0976-1792657.), filed by Regence Blue Shield of Idaho, Inc..(Smith, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vinci v. Regence Blue Shield of Idaho, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Vinci
Represented By: Chip Giles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regence Blue Shield of Idaho, Inc.
Represented By: William Keith Smith
Represented By: John Christopher Hughes
Represented By: James L Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does I-X
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?