Wisdom v. Gugino et al
Appellee: Hamilton Michaelson & Hilty, LLP, Karen McMurtrie, Anthony M Pantera, IV, Terry Michaelson, Jeremy Gugino, Francis R Stern and New York Life Insurance Company
Appellant: Allen L Wisdom
Case Number: 1:2018cv00477
Filed: October 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING APPELLEE NEW YORK LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY'S MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO FILE ANSWERING BRIEF AND SUPPLEMENTAL EXCERPTS OFRECORD granting #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief and Supplemental Excerpts of Record. Appellee Answering Brief due by 1/24/2019. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs) Modified on 12/11/2018 to reflect placed in the mail to Appellant on 12/12/2018 (cjs).
December 11, 2018 NOTICE TO COURT that counsel Julianne S. Hall wishes to no longer be noticed electronically on this case as of the date of this notice. (Hall, Julianne)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Granting Appellees Frances R. Stern and Anthony M. Pantera IV's Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Answering Brief and Supplemental Excerpts of Record. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
December 10, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief and Supplemental Excerpts of Record Carsten A Peterson appearing for Appellee New York Life Insurance Company. Responses due by 12/31/2018 (Peterson, Carsten)
December 7, 2018 Filing 11 Certificate of Readiness (Attachments: #1 Bankruptcy Court Certificate of Service)(cjs)
December 7, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 Memorandum/Brief (generic) Keely E. Duke appearing for Appellees Anthony M Pantera, IV, Francis R Stern. Responses due by 12/28/2018 (Duke, Keely)
December 4, 2018 Filing 6 Excerpt of Record filed by Appellant Allen L Wisdom (jp)(attachment too voluminous to scan- located in Clerk's office)
December 4, 2018 Filing 5 APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal, filed by Allen L Wisdom. (Attachment to dkt 6 too voluminous to scan- located in Clerk's Office). (jp)
November 28, 2018 Filing 4 Docket Note: Because the record is voluminous, only dkt nos. 78, 112, 113, 156 & 157 from the adversary case 13-6045 are attached to the Designation of Record (dkt #3 ). The rest of the record is available in the adversary case 13-6045. (jp)
November 28, 2018 Filing 3 Notice of Designations of Record by Allen L. Wisdom (Adversary dkt #204) (Attachments: #1 Adv. dkt #78 Amended Complaint, #2 Adv. dkt 112 Memorandum of Decision, #3 Adv. dkt #113 Order, #4 Adv. dkt #156 Memorandum of Decision, #5 Adv. #157 Order)(jp)
October 29, 2018 Filing 2 Notice of Filing Bankruptcy Appeal by Allen L Wisdom (cjs)
October 19, 2018 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 13-06045-TLM (11-01135-TLM & BAP No. ID-18-1245). File received and Receipt Number 64819, Fee Amount $298 paid in Bankruptcy Court (Notice sent to BK Judge and CA), filed by Allen L Wisdom. (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, #2 Order, 5/5/2015, #3 Order Dismissing Complaint Against Defendants Stern and Pantera, 3/7/2016, #4 Judgment, 5/18/2016, #5 BAP Transmittal received 10/4/2018, #6 Third Amended General Order No. 38)(cjs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wisdom v. Gugino et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Hamilton Michaelson & Hilty, LLP
Represented By: Terry M Michaelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Karen McMurtrie
Represented By: Terry M Michaelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Anthony M Pantera, IV
Represented By: Keely E. Duke
Represented By: Julianne Slayton Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Terry Michaelson
Represented By: Terry M Michaelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Jeremy Gugino
Represented By: Joshua S Evett
Represented By: Jade C Stacey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Francis R Stern
Represented By: Keely E. Duke
Represented By: Julianne Slayton Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: New York Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Carsten A Peterson
Represented By: Timothy Ryan Kurtz
Represented By: Mark S Prusynski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Allen L Wisdom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?