Western Watersheds Project v. Bureau of Land Management
Plaintiff: Western Watersheds Project
Defendant: Bureau of Land Management
Case Number: 1:2018cv00505
Filed: November 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Ronald E Bush
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Lake on behalf of Western Watersheds Project (Lake, Scott)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER. This case is hereby stayed in accordance with General Order No. 339. Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (km)
December 31, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Change of Address by Talasi B Brooks (Brooks, Talasi)
November 26, 2018 Filing 5 Another Summons Issued as to Bureau of Land Management (Print attached Summons for service.) (jp)
November 21, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Bureau of Land Management (Print attached Summons for service.) (alw)
November 14, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Western Watersheds Project. (Brooks, Talasi)
November 14, 2018 Filing 2 ERRATA by Plaintiff Western Watersheds Project re #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet. (Brooks, Talasi)
November 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bureau of Land Management ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1811354.), filed by Western Watersheds Project. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Brooks, Talasi)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Western Watersheds Project v. Bureau of Land Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau of Land Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Western Watersheds Project
Represented By: Talasi B Brooks
Represented By: Scott Lake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?