Jackson v. Automated Accounts, Inc
Plaintiff: Mallisa Jackson and Automated Accounts, Inc
Case Number: 1:2018cv00534
Filed: November 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2019 The Clerk of Court closed this case on 1/25/2019 pursuant to the #5 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (cjs)
January 24, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Mallisa Jackson (Smith, Barkley)
December 13, 2018 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Automated Accounts, Inc, filed by Mallisa Jackson.(Smith, Barkley)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - Case Management deadline set for 1/23/2019 for the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 1/30/2019 09:30 AM in Boise - Courtroom 6 before Judge Candy W. Dale. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
December 4, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Automated Accounts, Inc. (Print attached Summons for service.) (cjs)
November 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Automated Accounts, Inc ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1818014.), filed by Mallisa Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Cover Sheet)(Smith, Barkley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Automated Accounts, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mallisa Jackson
Represented By: Barkley Bissell Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Automated Accounts, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?