Bosse v. Carlin et al
Plaintiff: Michael Earl Bosse
Defendant: GEO Corp. Inc., Kim Madsen, Michael Reardon, Idaho Department of Corrections and Carlin
Case Number: 1:2018cv00539
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Emergency Injunction. Medical Care and Living Conditions by Plaintiff Michael Earl Bosse. Responses due by 1/28/2019 (jp)
December 26, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE by Michael Earl Bosse re: Grievance Concern Form (jp)
December 10, 2018 Filing 6 Emergency MOTION for Medical Care of Inmates, Injunction to Force Medical Careby Plaintiff Michael Earl Bosse. Responses due by 12/31/2018 (alw) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/12/2018: #1 Grievance form) (alw).
December 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER of Conditional Filing - (jp)
December 6, 2018 Filing 4 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (jp)
December 6, 2018 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Michael Earl Bosse. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Exhibits continued, #3 Exhibits continued)(jp)
December 6, 2018 Filing 2 Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account, This is a sealed document. re #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael Earl Bosse. (jp)
December 6, 2018 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Michael Earl Bosse. Responses due by 12/27/2018 (jp) . (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/9/2018: #1 Motion and Affidavit for Permission to Proceed on Partial Payment of Court Fees) (jp).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bosse v. Carlin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEO Corp. Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Madsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Reardon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Idaho Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Earl Bosse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?