Romish Holdings, LLC v. Inclusion, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Romish Holdings, LLC
Defendant: OII, LLC and Inclusion, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00562
Filed: December 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Lodge
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by OII, LLC. (Varin, J. Will)
February 15, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , CROSSCLAIM against Inclusion, Inc. by OII, LLC.(Varin, J. Will)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 MOTION to Continue filed by Romish Holdings, LLC. IT IS ORDERED that the deadline for both parties to file discovery and litigation plans be extended for 30 days from the filing of the motion. Signed by Judge Edward J. Lodge. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
February 14, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Romish Holdings, LLC. (Wieland, Jaren)
February 13, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Inclusion, Inc.. (Charney, Dennis)
February 13, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Continue Jaren Nichole Wieland appearing for Plaintiff Romish Holdings, LLC. Responses due by 3/6/2019 (Wieland, Jaren)
February 7, 2019 NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (cjs)
February 7, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Inclusion, Inc., Romish Holdings, LLC re #1 Complaint, #4 Answer to Complaint Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 4/8/2019. (cjs)
February 7, 2019 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - The entry docket number #6 Affidavit of Service, LLC, #5 Affidavit of Service filed by Romish Holdings, LLC were filed incorrectly in this case as the wrong event was used. In future, the correct event to use is "Summons Returned Executed" located under Service of Process. Using this event prompts for entry of the service date and then correctly sets the answer deadline in ECF.No action is needed by the filing party at this time.(cjs)
January 17, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Inclusion on January 4, 2019, filed by Romish Holdings, LLC. (Wieland, Jaren)
January 17, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on OII, LLC on January 4, 2019, filed by Romish Holdings, LLC. (Wieland, Jaren)
January 15, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Inclusion, Inc..(Charney, Dennis)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. On or before 2/13/2019, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 2/22/2019 10:00 AM in Boise Chambers before Judge Edward J. Lodge. Signed by Judge Edward J. Lodge. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
December 21, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Inclusion, Inc., OII, LLC. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons OII, LLC)(alw)
December 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1826540.), filed by Romish Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Summons Inclusion, Inc., #7 Summons OII, LLC, #8 Cover Sheet)(Wieland, Jaren) Modified on 12/21/2018 to remove duplicate language on attachments (alw). Modified on 1/11/2019 (cjs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Romish Holdings, LLC v. Inclusion, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OII, LLC
Represented By: J. Will Varin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inclusion, Inc.
Represented By: Dennis M Charney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Romish Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Jaren Nichole Wieland
Represented By: Steven P Wieland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?