Martin et al v. The Cincinnati Insurance Companies et al

Plaintiff: Lisa Martin and Stanley Martin
Defendant: John and Jane Does 1 through X and The Cincinnati Insurance Companies
Case Number: 1:2018cv00567
Filed: December 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Ronald E Bush
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2019 Filing 18 ALL PARTIES HAVE CONSENTED TO PROCEED BEFORE A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE(alw)
February 12, 2019 Filing 17 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ronald E. Bush: Scheduling Conference held on 2/12/2019, Status Conference held on 2/12/2019, ( Telephonic Status Conference set for 6/12/2019 11:30 AM in Telephonic Hearing - Boise,Id. before Judge Ronald E. Bush.). (Court Reporter/ESR lcase.) Audio File Location Boise - Courtroom 7. (lc)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #13 MOTION for Leave to File a First Amended Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial. Plaintiffs have since filed their First Amended Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial (Docket No. #15 ). Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint by February 26, 2019. (The Cincinnati Insurance Companies answer due 2/26/2019.) In light of Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint, Defendants Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (Docket No. #10 ) is DENIED, as moot and without prejudice. Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
February 12, 2019 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs.(Johnson, Sam)
February 7, 2019 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #10 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Lisa Martin, Stanley Martin. Replies due by 2/21/2019.(Johnson, Sam)
February 6, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to File a First Amended Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial Sam Johnson appearing for Plaintiffs Lisa Martin, Stanley Martin. Responses due by 2/27/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Support of Motion for Leave to File a First Amended Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial)(Johnson, Sam)
February 5, 2019 Filing 12 DOCKET TEXT NOTICE: The deadlines in DOC. 8 are vacated for filing of both the Litigation and Discovery Plans; However the 2/12/19 TSC shall remain as set. (lc)
January 17, 2019 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support re #10 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by The Cincinnati Insurance Companies.(Bernstein, Lloyd)
January 17, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Lloyd Bernstein appearing for Defendant The Cincinnati Insurance Companies. Responses due by 2/7/2019 (Bernstein, Lloyd)
January 10, 2019 Filing 9 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (jp)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. On or before 2/4/2019, the parties must file with the Court the JOINT Litigation Plan and Discovery Plans. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 2/12/2019 11:30 AM in Boise - Courtroom 7 before Judge Ronald E. Bush. Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
January 3, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Lisa Martin, Stanley Martin, and The Cincinnati Insurance Companies re #6 Answer to Complaint and #1 Notice of Removal. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 3/4/2019. (st)
January 2, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by The Cincinnati Insurance Companies. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bernstein, Lloyd)
December 28, 2018 Filing 5 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER Approving #4 Application for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Lloyd Bernstein for The Cincinnati Insurance Companies. Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
December 27, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Lloyd Bernstein. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1828428.)Michael A Guadagno appearing for Defendant The Cincinnati Insurance Companies. Responses due by 1/17/2019 (Guadagno, Michael)
December 26, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Cincinnati Insurance Companies identifying Corporate Parent Cincinnati Financial Corporation for The Cincinnati Insurance Companies.. (Guadagno, Michael)
December 26, 2018 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by The Cincinnati Insurance Companies. (Guadagno, Michael)
December 26, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Cincinnati Insurance Companies from ADA County District Court, case number CV01-18-21547.(Filing fee $400 receipt number0976-1827877.), filed by The Cincinnati Insurance Companies. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 State Court Docket, #3 State Court Service Documents)(Guadagno, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin et al v. The Cincinnati Insurance Companies et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Martin
Represented By: Sam Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanley Martin
Represented By: Sam Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does 1 through X
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Cincinnati Insurance Companies
Represented By: Michael A Guadagno
Represented By: Lloyd Bernstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?