Bainbridge v. Ramirez

Petitioner: Randall Wayne Bainbridge
Respondent: Ramirez
Case Number: 1:2019cv00003
Filed: January 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that this entire case is DISMISSED for lack of jurisdiction. This case is also ordered closed. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL REVIEW ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: 1. The Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Dkt. #2 ) is DISMISSED for lack of jurisdiction. 2. The Clerk of Court shall provide Petitioner with a copy of the successive petitions form to be filed with the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit. 3. The application to proceed in forma pauperis (Dkt. #1 ) is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)(USCA form mailed with this Order to Petitioner.)
January 14, 2019 Filing 6 ALL PARTIES HAVE CONSENTED TO PROCEED BEFORE A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE (Attachments: #1 Consent by Respondent)(cjs)
January 14, 2019 Filing 5 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (cjs)
January 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Randall Wayne Bainbridge, Ramirez Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 3/11/2019. (cjs) (Main Document 4 replaced on 1/8/2019) (cjs).
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER of Conditional Filing - (cjs)
January 4, 2019 Filing 2 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Randall Wayne Bainbridge. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Blank Application for Leave to File Second or Successive Petition)(cjs)
January 4, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Randall Wayne Bainbridge. Responses due by 1/25/2019 (cjs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bainbridge v. Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ramirez
Represented By: L LaMont Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Randall Wayne Bainbridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?