Rogue v. Equifax Information Services, LLC
Plaintiff: John Manuel Rogue
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00005
Filed: January 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Carpenter, Charles)
February 19, 2019 NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (alw)
February 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Equifax Information Services, LLC, John Manuel Rogue Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 4/22/2019. (alw)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER. ORDERED that the motion #3 shall be, and hereby is, GRANTED; and it isFURTHER ORDERED that Defendants time to respond to the Complaint shall be, andhereby is, EXTENDED to March 11, 2019. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (alw)
February 8, 2019 Filing 3 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint Charles Henry Carpenter appearing for Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC. Responses due by 3/1/2019 (Carpenter, Charles)
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Print attached Summons for service.) (alw)
January 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Equifax Information Services, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1830641.), filed by John Manuel Rogue. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Cover Sheet)(Smith, Barkley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rogue v. Equifax Information Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Charles Henry Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Manuel Rogue
Represented By: Barkley Bissell Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?