Allscripts Healthcare, LLC v. St Luke's Health System Ltd

Plaintiff: Allscripts Healthcare, LLC
Defendant: St Luke's Health System Ltd
Case Number: 1:2019cv00019
Filed: January 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer St Luke's Health System Ltd answer due 4/11/2019. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (dm)
March 11, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, [Defendant's Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint and Request to Vacate Telephonic Scheduling Conference] Alexandra Shantel Grande appearing for Defendant St Luke's Health System Ltd. Responses due by 4/1/2019 (Grande, Alexandra)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - Case Management deadline set for 4/4/2019 for the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 4/11/2019 11:00 AM in Boise Chambers before Judge B. Lynn Winmill. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
February 12, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by St Luke's Health System Ltd. (Grande, Alexandra)
February 12, 2019 NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (cjs)
February 12, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Allscripts Healthcare, LLC, St Luke's Health System Ltd Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 4/15/2019. (cjs)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. St Luke's Health System Ltd answer due 3/11/2019. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
February 11, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, [Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint] Alexandra Shantel Grande appearing for Defendant St Luke's Health System Ltd. Responses due by 3/4/2019 (Grande, Alexandra)
February 1, 2019 Filing 6 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER Approving #5 Application for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Caren D Enloe for Allscripts Healthcare, LLC. Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
January 30, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Caren D. Enloe. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1840842.)Joshua S Evett appearing for Plaintiff Allscripts Healthcare, LLC. Responses due by 2/20/2019 (Evett, Joshua)
January 24, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allscripts Healthcare, LLC. St Luke's Health System Ltd served on 1/21/2019, answer due 2/11/2019. (Evett, Joshua)
January 24, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Allscripts Healthcare, LLC. (Evett, Joshua)
January 18, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to St Luke's Health System Ltd. (Print attached Summons for service.) (jp)
January 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against St Luke's Health System Ltd ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1835763.), filed by Allscripts Healthcare, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Complaint, #2 Exhibit B to Complaint, #3 Exhibit C to Complaint, #4 Summons, #5 Cover Sheet)(Evett, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allscripts Healthcare, LLC v. St Luke's Health System Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St Luke's Health System Ltd
Represented By: A. Dean Bennett
Represented By: Alexandra Shantel Grande
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allscripts Healthcare, LLC
Represented By: Joshua S Evett
Represented By: Caren D Enloe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?