J.R. Simplot Company v. Elea Vertriebs-und-Vermarktungsgesellschaft, mbH et al

Plaintiff: J.R. Simplot Company
Defendant: Elea Vertriebs-und-Vermarktungsgesellschaft, mbH and Food Physics LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00024
Filed: January 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER: In consideration of Plaintiff's Status Report #4 , the Court hereby vacates the Case Management deadline of 3/31/2019 and the Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 3/28/2019. Plaintiffs are also hereby ordered to file a status report on or before April 19, 2019 regarding any developments pertinent to this case. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (ah)
March 1, 2019 Filing 4 STATUS REPORT on Service of Process by J.R. Simplot Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Herberholz, Dana)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - Case Management deadline set for 3/21/2019 for the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 3/28/2019 11:00 AM in Boise - Courtroom 6 before Judge Candy W. Dale. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
January 28, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Elea Vertriebs-und-Vermarktungsgesellschaft, mbH, Food Physics LLC. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued - Food Physics LLC)(cjs)
January 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1838196.), filed by J.R. Simplot Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Illinois Complaint, #2 Cover Sheet, #3 Summons to Elea, #4 Summons to Food Physics)(Herberholz, Dana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J.R. Simplot Company v. Elea Vertriebs-und-Vermarktungsgesellschaft, mbH et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elea Vertriebs-und-Vermarktungsgesellschaft, mbH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Food Physics LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.R. Simplot Company
Represented By: Dana M Herberholz
Represented By: Jordan Lee Stott
Represented By: Christopher J Cuneo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?