United States of America v. Bonocore et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Joseph J. Bonocore and Phyllis A. Bonocore
Case Number: 1:2019cv00054
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2019 Filing 4 STATUS REPORT regarding service by United States of America. (Cerling, Dylan)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - Case Management deadline set for 5/7/2019 for the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 5/14/2019 11:00 AM in Boise - Courtroom 6 before Judge Candy W. Dale. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Joseph J. Bonocore, Phyllis A. Bonocore. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued - Phyllis A. Bonocore)(cjs)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Joseph J. Bonocore, Phyllis A. Bonocore, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Joseph Bonocore, #3 Summons Phyllis Bonocore)(Cerling, Dylan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Bonocore et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph J. Bonocore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phyllis A. Bonocore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Dylan Christopher Cerling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?