Siegfried v. Bartlett et al

Plaintiff: Randy Donald Siegfried, Jr
Defendant: Stephen Bartlett and Ada County Jail Warden
Case Number: 1:2019cv00055
Filed: February 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER FOR IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS AND WITHDRAWAL OF INMATE FILING FEE FROM PRISON TRUST ACCOUNT (Notice sent to Finance). IT IS ORDERED: Plaintiffs Application for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Dkt. #1 ) is GRANTED. The Director of the Idaho Department of Correction or his designee will collect from Plaintiffs prison trust account the $350.00 balance of the filing fee and will forward payments to the Clerk of Court. The Clerk of Court is directed to serve a copy of this order on the Director of the Idaho Department of Correction.. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (km) (Order mailed to Josh Tewalt, Director, Idaho Department of Correction, Attn: Inmate Accounts, 1299 N Orchard, Suite 110, Boise, ID 83706)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER of Conditional Filing - (alw)
February 6, 2019 Filing 6 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (alw)
February 6, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Ada County Jail Warden, Stephen Bartlett, filed by Randy Donald Siegfried, Jr.(alw) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/4/2019: #1 complaint) (alw).
February 6, 2019 Filing 2 Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account, This is a sealed document. re #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Randy Donald Siegfried, Jr. (alw)
February 6, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Randy Donald Siegfried, Jr. Responses due by 2/27/2019 (alw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Siegfried v. Bartlett et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Bartlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ada County Jail Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Donald Siegfried, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?