Scentsy, Inc. v. Kellytoy Worldwide, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Scentsy, Inc.
Defendant: Kellytoy (USA), Inc. and Kellytoy Worldwide, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00059
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Injunctive Relief Ryan Thomas McFarland appearing for Plaintiff Scentsy, Inc.. Responses due by 4/25/2019 (McFarland, Ryan)
April 2, 2019 Filing 8 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Kellytoy (USA), Inc., Kellytoy Worldwide, Inc. re #7 MOTION for Entry of Default filed by Scentsy, Inc. (jp)
March 18, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Entry of Default Ryan Thomas McFarland appearing for Plaintiff Scentsy, Inc.. Responses due by 4/8/2019 (McFarland, Ryan)
March 13, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scentsy, Inc.. Kellytoy (USA), Inc. served on 2/22/2019, answer due 3/15/2019. (McFarland, Ryan)
March 13, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scentsy, Inc.. Kellytoy Worldwide, Inc. served on 2/22/2019, answer due 3/15/2019. (McFarland, Ryan)
February 22, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action (Notice sent to USPTO) (Attachments: #1 Complaint (dkt 1)) (jp)
February 16, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Kellytoy (USA), Inc., Kellytoy Worldwide, Inc. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons)(jp)
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Scentsy, Inc.. (McFarland, Ryan)
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1849218.), filed by Scentsy, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons Kellytoy Worldwide, Inc., #2 Summons Kellytoy (USA), Inc., #3 Cover Sheet Civil Information Sheet)(McFarland, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scentsy, Inc. v. Kellytoy Worldwide, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scentsy, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan Thomas McFarland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kellytoy (USA), Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kellytoy Worldwide, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?