Sturdy Gun Safe, Incorporated v. Rhino Metals, Incorporated
Plaintiff: Sturdy Gun Safe, Incorporated
Defendant: Rhino Metals, Incorporated
Case Number: 1:2019cv00063
Filed: February 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER CONSOLIDATING ACTIONS AND REASSIGNING (22 in 1:18-cv-00474-EJL) - NOW THEREFORE IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion to Consolidate (Dkt. 22)is GRANTED. Case No. 1:18-cv-00474-EJL and Case No. 1:19-00063-DCN are HEREBYCONSOLIDATED as stated herein. All future filings shall be made in the docket of the lead case only and shall bear a caption substantially similar to the format used in this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Case No. 1:18-cv-00474-EJL is HEREBY REASSIGNED for all purposes to the Honorable David C. Nye, Chief United States District Court Judge. The Clerk of the Court shall file this Order in both cases. Signed by Judge Edward J. Lodge. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-00474-EJL, 1:19-cv-00063-DCN(caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
February 20, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Substitution - Attorney Bradley J Dixon,Preston N Carter,Melodie Annalise McQuade for Sturdy Gun Safe, Incorporated,Bradley J Dixon,Preston N Carter,Melodie Annalise McQuade for Sturdy Gun Safe, Incorporated added. Attorney D. Greg Durbin and Shane Garrett Smith terminated. (Carter, Preston)
February 19, 2019 Filing 23 ANSWER to #2 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Sturdy Gun Safe, Incorporated by Rhino Metals, Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (D774,272), #2 Exhibit 2 (D744,715))(Donahey, Teague)
February 19, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Rhino Metals, Incorporated, Sturdy Gun Safe, Incorporated Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 4/22/2019. (cjs)
February 19, 2019 All out of state counsel continuing representation need to obtain local counsel and file an Application for Pro Hac Vice. Please see Local Rule, Civil Rule 83.4 Bar Admission e) Pro Hac Vice/Local Counsel and ECF Procedures 3. Registration, Logins and Passwords. B. Limited Registered Participants.1. (cjs)
February 19, 2019 Filing 21 Case transferred in from District of California Eastern; Case Number 1:18-cv-01452. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING #9 Motion to Dismiss; this Court Lacks Personal Jurisdiction over Defendant;Clerk of the Court is directed to transfer this case to the United States District Court for the District of Idaho, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 02/14/19. CASE CLOSED (Martin-Gill, S)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT Only): Due to the current status of the case, the Initial SCHEDULING CONFERENCE is continued from 1/31/2019 to April 23, 2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. The parties SHALL file a JOINT Scheduling Report one week prior to the conference. The parties wishing to appear telephonically for said hearing, may do so with each party using the following dial-in number and passcode: dial-in number 1-877-411-9748; passcode 3190866. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/22/2019. NOTE: Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #9 ) pending before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Valdez, E)
January 2, 2019 Filing 18 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 12-18-18, Motion to Dismiss before District Judge Dale A. Drozd, filed by Court Reporter Karen Hooven, Phone number 559-264-0584 E-mail karenhooven@yahoo.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction must be filed within 5 court days. Redaction Request due 1/25/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/4/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/4/2019. (Hooven, K)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT Only) Parties wishing to appear telephonically at the Scheduling Conference currently set for Thursday, January 31, 2019 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe may do so with each party using the following dial-in number and passcode: dial-in number 1-877-411-9748; passcode 3190866. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/19/2018. (Valdez, E)
December 18, 2018 Filing 17 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings before District Judge Dale A. Drozd: MOTION HEARING held on 12/18/2018. #9 Motion to Dismiss, argued, submitted and taken under submission. Written order will issue. Plaintiff's Counsel Shane Smith present. Defendant's Counsel Teague Donahey present. Court Reporter/CD Number: Karen Hooven. (Thorp, J)
December 18, 2018 Filing 15 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Rhino Metals, Incorporated for proceedings held on 12/18/2018 before Judge Drozd. Court Reporter Karen Hooven. (Donahey, Teague)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER: (Text Only) signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 12/13/2018; the parties are encouraged to appear telephonically for the #9 Motion to Dismiss on calendar 12/18/2018, and may do so by dialing 877-402-9757 (access code 6966236) at 9:45AM . Because the court may be hearing other matters using the same conference line, please wait to state your appearance until your case has been called and appearances are requested. Keep all background noise to a minimum. Use of any feature(s) that may have an impact upon the quality of voice transmission (such as speakerphones, headsets, etc.) are prohibited; use of a land line or hand-held cell phone is required. At least 24 hours prior to the hearing, if you have not already done so, you must email Courtroom Deputy Jami Thorp, at JThorp@caed.uscourts.gov, to advise the court you will be appearing telephonically.(Gonzales, V) Modified on 12/13/2018 to reflect correct time. (Gonzales, V).
December 10, 2018 Filing 13 REPLY by Rhino Metals, Incorporated to RESPONSE to #9 MOTION to DISMISS. (Donahey, Teague)
December 4, 2018 Filing 12 OPPOSITION by Sturdy Gun Safe, Incorporated to #9 MOTION to DISMISS. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Shane Smith, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Declaration of Stephen J. Zralek)(Smith, Shane)
December 3, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Shane Garrett Smith on behalf of Sturdy Gun Safe, Incorporated. Attorney Smith, Shane Garrett added. (Smith, Shane)
November 13, 2018 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Rhino Metals, Incorporated. (Donahey, Teague)
November 13, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to DISMISS by Rhino Metals, Incorporated. Attorney Donahey, Teague Ian added. Motion Hearing set for 12/18/2018 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration of Don Suggs, #3 Declaration of Teague Donahey, #4 Exhibit 1 to Donahey Decl., #5 Exhibit 2 to Donahey Decl., #6 Exhibit 3 to Donahey Decl., #7 Exhibit 4 to Donahey Decl., #8 Exhibit 5 to Donahey Decl., #9 Exhibit 6 to Donahey Decl.)(Donahey, Teague)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CONSENT ORDER Granting Substitution of Attorney, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/9/18. Added attorney D. Greg Durbin for Sturdy Gun Safe, Incorporated, attorney Dylan Ruga terminated. (Marrujo, C)
November 8, 2018 Filing 7 SUBSTITUTION of ATTORNEY - PROPOSED, submitted by Sturdy Gun Safe, Incorporated. (Durbin, D.)
November 8, 2018 Filing 6 SUBSTITUTION of ATTORNEY - PROPOSED, submitted by Sturdy Gun Safe, Incorporated. (Durbin, D.)
October 22, 2018 Filing 5 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 1/31/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Attachments: #1 DAD Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Hellings, J)
October 22, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Rhino Metals, Incorporated* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Dylan Ruga* *Stalwart Law Group* *1100 Glendon Avenue, Suite 1840* *Los Angeles, CA 90024*. (Hellings, J)
October 19, 2018 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Plaintiff Sturdy Gun Safe, Incorporated. (Ruga, Dylan)
October 19, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Rhino Metals, Incorporated by Sturdy Gun Safe, Incorporated. Attorney Ruga, Dylan added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-7928466) (Ruga, Dylan)
October 19, 2018 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Sturdy Gun Safe, Incorporated (Ruga, Dylan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sturdy Gun Safe, Incorporated v. Rhino Metals, Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sturdy Gun Safe, Incorporated
Represented By: Dylan Ruga
Represented By: D. Greg Durbin
Represented By: Shane Garrett Smith
Represented By: Preston N Carter
Represented By: Melodie Annalise McQuade
Represented By: Bradley J Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhino Metals, Incorporated
Represented By: Teague Ian Donahey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?