Viking Insurance Company of Wisconsin v. Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Viking Insurance Company of Wisconsin
Defendant: JL5, LLC d/b/a Idaho Pizza Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Jason Simmons, Elisabeth Morissin and JLC 5, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00064
Filed: February 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2019 Filing 5 STATUS REPORT ON SERVICE OF PROCESS by Viking Insurance Company of Wisconsin. (Munson, Herbert)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - Case Management deadline set for 4/24/2019 for the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 5/1/2019 11:00 AM in Boise - Courtroom 6 before Judge Candy W. Dale. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
February 27, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to JLC 5, LLC, Elisabeth Morissin, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Jason Simmons. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued - Elisabeth Morissin, #2 Summons Issued - JLC 5, LLC, #3 Summons Issued - Jason Simmons)(cjs)
February 20, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Viking Insurance Company of Wisconsin identifying Corporate Parent Sentry Insurance A Mutual Company for Viking Insurance Company of Wisconsin.. (Munson, Herbert)
February 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1850289.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Summons Nationwide, #2 Summons Morissin, #3 Summons JLC5, LLC, #4 Summons Simmons, #5 Cover Sheet)(Munson, Herbert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Viking Insurance Company of Wisconsin v. Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Viking Insurance Company of Wisconsin
Represented By: Herbert Matthew Munson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JL5, LLC d/b/a Idaho Pizza Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elisabeth Morissin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JLC 5, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?