Kitchen et al v. Ferney et al

Plaintiff: Scott McQuarrie, Stephen Kitchen and R Scott McQuarrie
Defendant: Eagle Storage, LLC, Greg Ferney, Nampa Storage, LLC, ES 2.8 LLC and ES 5.0 LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00074
Filed: February 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: William B Shubb
Referring Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2019 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Stephen Kitchen, R Scott McQuarrie (Chandler, Aaron)
April 17, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimbell D Gourley on behalf of Eagle Storage, LLC, Greg Ferney, Nampa Storage, LLC (Gourley, Kimbell)
April 16, 2019 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - The entry docket number #12 Affidavit of Service, Summons Returned Executed, filed by Stephen Kitchen, R Scott McQuarrie, #13 Summons Returned Executed filed by Stephen Kitchen, R Scott McQuarrie were filed incorrectly in this case. An erroneous service date of 3/26/2019 was entered and it should be 3/27/2019.No action is needed by the filing party as the Clerk's Office will edit the entries and correct the answer due deadline from 4/16/2019 to 4/17/2019. Also in future remember to always use the event of "Summons Returned Executed".(cjs)
April 9, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - Scheduling Conference set for 8/5/2019 02:30 PM in Boise - Courtroom 1 before Judge William B. Shubb. Case Management deadline set for 7/22/2019 for the joint Litigation Plan. Signed by Judge William B. Shubb. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
April 8, 2019 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change. This case has been reassigned to Judge William B. Shubb. Please use case number 1:19-cv-00074-WBS on all future pleadings. (st)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT. This case is reassigned to Judge William B. Shubb from the Eastern District of California for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
April 2, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stephen Kitchen, R Scott McQuarrie. ES 5.0 LLC served on 3/27/2019, answer due 4/17/2019. (Chandler, Aaron) Modified on 4/16/2019 pursuant to Corrective Entry (cjs).
April 2, 2019 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Amended Complaint and Summons served on ES 2.8 on 3/27/2019, filed by Stephen Kitchen, R Scott McQuarrie., SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stephen Kitchen, R Scott McQuarrie. ES 2.8 LLC served on 3/26/2019, answer due 4/17/2019. (Chandler, Aaron) Modified on 4/16/2019 pursuant to Corrective Entry (cjs).
March 27, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Stephen Kitchen, R Scott McQuarrie. Eagle Storage, LLC waiver sent on 3/26/2019, answer due 5/28/2019; Greg Ferney waiver sent on 3/26/2019, answer due 5/28/2019; Nampa Storage, LLC waiver sent on 3/26/2019, answer due 5/28/2019. (Scott, Jared)
March 26, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to ES 2.8 LLC, ES 5.0 LLC. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued - ES 5.0 LLC)(cjs)
March 25, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury against All Defendants, filed by Stephen Kitchen, R Scott McQuarrie.(Chandler, Aaron) Modified on 3/26/2019 (cjs).
March 21, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Stephen Kitchen, Scott McQuarrie (Chandler, Aaron)
March 21, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Stephen Kitchen, Scott McQuarrie (Chandler, Aaron)
March 6, 2019 Filing 6 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER re #5 Errata, approving #2 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Heather M Sneddon for Stephen Kitchen, R Scott McQuarrie; approving #3 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Jared D Scott for Stephen Kitchen, Scott McQuarrie. Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs) Modified on 3/26/2019 (cjs).
March 5, 2019 Filing 5 ERRATA by Plaintiffs Stephen Kitchen, R Scott McQuarrie re #2 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Heather M. Sneddon. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1854619.), #3 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Jared D. Scott. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1854623.) . (Attachments: #1 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Chandler, Aaron) (Main Document 5 replaced on 3/6/2019 to prevent changes to document) (cjs). (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/6/2019 to prevent changes to document) (cjs). Modified on 3/26/2019 (cjs).
March 5, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Eagle Storage, LLC, Greg Ferney, Nampa Storage, LLC. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued - Eagle Storage, LLC, #2 Summons Issued - Nampa Storage, LLC)(cjs)
March 5, 2019 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - The entry docket number #2 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Heather M. Sneddon. (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1854619.), #3 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Jared D. Scott. (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1854623.) filed by Scott McQuarrie, Stephen Kitchen were filed incorrectly in this case. The required application form was not used. The form is available on our website. The filing party shall submit their correct forms using the event of "Errata" located under Other Documents and link to dockets 2 and 3. Using this event will prevent duplicate charges.(cjs) Modified on 3/5/2019 (cjs).
February 27, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Jared D. Scott. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1854623.)Aaron M Chandler appearing for Plaintiffs Stephen Kitchen, R Scott McQuarrie. Responses due by 3/20/2019 (Chandler, Aaron) Modified on 3/26/2019 (cjs).
February 27, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Heather M. Sneddon. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1854619.)Aaron M Chandler appearing for Plaintiffs Stephen Kitchen, R Scott McQuarrie. Responses due by 3/20/2019 (Chandler, Aaron) Modified on 3/26/2019 (cjs).
February 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against Greg Ferney, Eagle Storage, LLC, and Nampa Storage, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1854571.), filed by Stephen Kitchen, R Scott McQuarrie. (Attachments: #1 Summons Greg Ferney, #2 Summons Eagle Storage, LLC, #3 Summons Nampa Storage, LLC, #4 Cover Sheet)(Chandler, Aaron) Modified on 2/27/2019 to correct docket text (km). Modified on 3/26/2019 (cjs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kitchen et al v. Ferney et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott McQuarrie
Represented By: Aaron M Chandler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Kitchen
Represented By: Aaron M Chandler
Represented By: Heather M Sneddon
Represented By: Jared D Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R Scott McQuarrie
Represented By: Aaron M Chandler
Represented By: Heather M Sneddon
Represented By: Jared D Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eagle Storage, LLC
Represented By: Kimbell D Gourley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Ferney
Represented By: Kimbell D Gourley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nampa Storage, LLC
Represented By: Kimbell D Gourley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ES 2.8 LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ES 5.0 LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?