United States of America v. Bland

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Shalimar Bland, Bland, Perkins, Shalimar D D Bland, Shalimar Dawn Perkins and Shalimar Dawn Bland
Case Number: 1:2019cv00111
Filed: April 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Ronald E Bush
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Student Loan
Cause of Action: 28:3001
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Shalimar Bland re #4 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant (Application for Entry of Default and Default Judgment against Defendant) filed by United States of America (km) (Main Document 5 replaced on 7/12/2019 to attach the correct PDF image and regenerate the NEF) (jp).
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant (Application for Entry of Default and Default Judgment against Defendant) William M Humphries appearing for Plaintiff United States of America. Responses due by 7/5/2019 (Attachments: #1 Declaration ISO App for Default)(Humphries, William)
May 6, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Shalimar Bland waiver sent on 4/4/2019, answer due 6/3/2019. (Humphries, William)
April 23, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Shalimar Bland. (Print attached Summons for service.) (cjs)
April 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Shalimar Bland, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Summons, #4 Cover Sheet)(Humphries, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Bland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shalimar Bland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shalimar D D Bland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shalimar Dawn Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shalimar Dawn Bland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: William M Humphries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?