LOL Finance Co. v. Choice Cattle, LLC et al
Plaintiff: LOL Finance Co.
Defendant: Choice Cattle, LLC, Kelly L. Mikelson, Paul L. Mikelson, Douglas D. Mikelson, Dwight G. Mebane and Manning's Beef, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00121
Filed: April 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Bastian
Referring Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2019 Filing 14 This case has been closed per the filing of a Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (docket #13). (st)
June 5, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by LOL Finance Co. (Hancock, Nicole)
May 16, 2019 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change. This case has been reassigned to Judge Stanley A. Bastian. Please use case number 1:19-cv-00121-SAB on all future pleadings. (st)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT. This case is reassigned to Judge Stanley A. Bastian with the Eastern District of Washington for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
May 9, 2019 Filing 11 STATUS REPORT by LOL Finance Co.. (Hancock, Nicole)
April 25, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by LOL Finance Co.. Manning's Beef, LLC served on 4/16/2019, answer due 5/7/2019. (Hancock, Nicole)
April 25, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by LOL Finance Co.. Douglas D. Mikelson served on 4/15/2019, answer due 5/6/2019. (Hancock, Nicole)
April 25, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by LOL Finance Co.. Kelly L. Mikelson served on 4/15/2019, answer due 5/6/2019. (Hancock, Nicole)
April 25, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by LOL Finance Co.. Paul L. Mikelson served on 4/15/2019, answer due 5/6/2019. (Hancock, Nicole)
April 25, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by LOL Finance Co.. Choice Cattle, LLC served on 4/15/2019, answer due 5/6/2019. (Hancock, Nicole)
April 15, 2019 Filing 5 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #3 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Jonathan C Miesen for LOL Finance Co. Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
April 15, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Choice Cattle, LLC, Manning's Beef, LLC, Dwight G. Mebane, Douglas D. Mikelson, Kelly L. Mikelson, Paul L. Mikelson. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued - Paul L. Mikelson, #2 Summons Issued - Kelly L. Mikelson, #3 Summons Issued - Douglas D. Mikelson, #4 Summons Issued - Manning's Beef, LLC, #5 Summons Issued - Dwight G. Mebane)(cjs)
April 12, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Jonathan C. Miesen. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1873972.)Nicole C Hancock appearing for Plaintiff LOL Finance Co.. Responses due by 5/3/2019 (Hancock, Nicole)
April 10, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by LOL Finance Co.. (Hancock, Nicole)
April 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1872386.), filed by LOL Finance Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Complaint, #2 Exhibit B to Complaint, #3 Exhibit C to Complaint, #4 Exhibit D to Complaint, #5 Exhibit E to Complaint, #6 Cover Sheet, #7 Summons Choice Cattle, #8 Summons Paul Mikelson, #9 Summons Kelly Mikelson, #10 Summons Douglas Mikelson, #11 Summons Manning Beef, LLC, #12 Summons Dwight Mebane)(Hancock, Nicole)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LOL Finance Co. v. Choice Cattle, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Choice Cattle, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly L. Mikelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul L. Mikelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas D. Mikelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dwight G. Mebane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manning's Beef, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LOL Finance Co.
Represented By: Anna E Courtney
Represented By: Nicole C Hancock
Represented By: Jonathan C Miesen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?