Byerly v. State of Idaho

Petitioner: Nathan Byerly
Respondent: State of Idaho, Christensen and Keith Yordy
Case Number: 1:2019cv00130
Filed: April 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Ronald E Bush
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2019 Filing 7 Amended PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Nathan Byerly. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(alw)
May 24, 2019 Filing 6 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (alw)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER of Conditional Filing - (alw)
April 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Nathan Byerly re #3 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, (alw)
April 15, 2019 Filing 3 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Nathan Byerly. (Attachments: #1 cover letter, #2 state court motion to stay, #3 state court order, #4 state court motion to certify, #5 state court notice, #6 state court cover letter)(alw)
April 15, 2019 Filing 2 Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account, This is a sealed document. re #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Nathan Byerly. (alw)
April 15, 2019 Filing 1 Prisoner APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Nathan Byerly. Responses due by 5/6/2019 (alw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Byerly v. State of Idaho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Idaho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Keith Yordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Nathan Byerly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?