Rogstad v. Yordy
Petitioner: Jesse Ryan Rogstad
Respondent: Yordy
Case Number: 1:2019cv00131
Filed: April 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Ronald E Bush
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Filing 10 Letter REQUEST by Petitioner Jesse Ryan Rogstad for (Attachments: #1 Mailed Approval Notice) (km)
May 13, 2019 Filing 9 ALL PARTIES HAVE CONSENTED TO PROCEED BEFORE A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE(alw)
May 8, 2019 Filing 8 Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account, This is a sealed document. re #4 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jesse Ryan Rogstad. (jp)
May 7, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST by Petitioner Jesse Ryan Rogstad for confirmation of receipt. (jp) (copy of dkt sheet mailed to Mr. Rogstad)
May 7, 2019 Filing 6 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (jp)
May 7, 2019 Filing 5 Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account, This is a sealed document. re #4 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jesse Ryan Rogstad. (jp)
May 7, 2019 Filing 4 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Jesse Ryan Rogstad. Responses due by 5/28/2019 (jp)
April 24, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to Jesse Ryan Rogstad and counsel for Yordy re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 6/24/2019. (cjs)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER of Conditional Filing - (cjs)
April 15, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Jesse Ryan Rogstad. (Attachments: #1 Application for Leave to File Second or Successive Petition)(cjs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rogstad v. Yordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Yordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jesse Ryan Rogstad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?