Halbesleben v. Akamatsu

Petitioner: Jessica D Halbesleben
Respondent: Shelley Akamatsu
Case Number: 1:2019cv00138
Filed: April 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Ronald E Bush
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL REVIEW ORDER re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Jessica D Halbesleben. Petitioner's Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Dkt. #1 ) is GRANTED. This case is stayed pending Petitioner's exhaustion of state court remedies, beginning with the state district court and ending with the Idaho Supreme Court. The Clerk of Court shall administratively terminate this case. Administrative termination does not alter the positions of the parties or the filing date of the petition. Petitioner shall file an amended petition and a motion to re-open this case within 30 days after the Idaho Supreme Court has entered an order in her case. Any amended petition must name a proper respondentthe custodian of the prison facility where Petitioner resides, not the prosecutor. Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
May 2, 2019 Filing 5 EXHIBIT A by Jessica D Halbesleben. (jp)
May 1, 2019 Filing 4 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (jp)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER of Conditional Filing - (jp)
April 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to Jessica D Halbesleben. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 6/18/2019. (jp)
April 19, 2019 RECEIPT: Fee Received $ 5, receipt # 24116 (jp)
April 18, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Jessica D Halbesleben.(jp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Halbesleben v. Akamatsu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Shelley Akamatsu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jessica D Halbesleben
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?