Bennett v. Lowe's Home Centers, LLC

Plaintiff: Cynthia A. Bennett
Defendant: Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00145
Filed: April 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Bastian
Referring Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 15 The 60 day deadline has expired. Case will remain with District Judge. No more notice of availability or assignment will be sent out. Consent deadline(s) termed. (alw)
June 6, 2019 Filing 14 Plaintiff's RESPONSE to Defendant's Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Remand, Seize Assets, and Cease and Desist doing Business in Idaho filed by Cynthia A. Bennett.Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/7/2019.(alw)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, Seize Assets, and Cease and Desist DoingBusiness in Idaho #7 is DENIED. Defendant's Motion to Dismiss #5 is GRANTED. Plaintiff's Motion to Deny Motion to Dismiss #10 is DENIED. Plaintiff is granted leave to file an Amended Complaint. Plaintiff is directed to file her Amended Complaint within 60 days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Stanley A. Bastian. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
June 3, 2019 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #10 MOTION re #5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC.Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of A. Dean Bennett)(Bennett, A.)
May 23, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION to Remand, Seize Assets, and Cease and Desist doing Business in Idaho filed by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. Replies due by 6/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Grace Ridley)(Bennett, A.)
May 20, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Deny Motion to Dismiss re #5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Plaintiff Cynthia A. Bennett. Responses due by 6/10/2019 (Attachments: #1 Order)(alw)
May 16, 2019 Filing 9 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (alw)
May 16, 2019 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change. This case has been reassigned to Judge Stanley A Bastian. Please use case number 1:19-cv-00145-SAB on all future pleadings. (st)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT. This case is reassigned to Judge Stanley A. Bastian from the Eastern District of Washington for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
May 2, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand, Seize Assets, and Cease and Desist doing Business in Idaho by Plaintiff Cynthia A. Bennett. Responses due by 5/23/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(alw)
April 29, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigants of the Summary Judgment Rule Requirement re #5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (alw)
April 29, 2019 Filing 5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim A. Dean Bennett appearing for Defendant Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. Responses due by 5/20/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Bennett, A.)
April 29, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Cynthia A. Bennett, Lowe's Home Centers, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 6/28/2019. (alw)
April 25, 2019 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet re Corrective Entry, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Bennett, A.)
April 25, 2019 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - The entry docket number #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC does not include the cover sheet. The filing party shall file the civil cover sheet.(alw)
April 25, 2019 RETURN OF SERVICE/PROCESS ASSUMED EXECUTED - Lowe's Home Centers, LLC served on 4/22/2019. (no service document on file, service assumed for internal reporting purpose only) (alw)
April 22, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Lowe's Companies, Inc. for Lowe's Home Centers, LLC.. (Bennett, A.)
April 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC from Fourth Judicial District - Ada County, case number CV01-19-04868.(Filing fee $400 receipt number0976-1878012.), filed by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Attachments: #1 State Court Docket - Exhibit A, #2 State Court Complaint Exhibit B, #3 State Court Service Documents Exhibit C, #4 Notice of Appearance - Exhibit D, #5 State Court Notice - Exhibit E)(Bennett, A.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bennett v. Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia A. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Represented By: A. Dean Bennett
Represented By: Alexandra Shantel Grande
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?