Lambertus v. State of Idaho
Petitioner: Frank O. Lambertus
Respondent: State of Idaho
Case Number: 1:2019cv00149
Filed: April 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Ronald E Bush
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2019 Filing 8 ALL PARTIES HAVE CONSENTED TO PROCEED BEFORE A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE(jp)
May 20, 2019 Filing 7 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (jp)
May 20, 2019 Filing 6 Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account, This is a sealed document. re #5 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Frank O. Lambertus. (jp)
May 20, 2019 Filing 5 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Frank O. Lambertus. Responses due by 6/10/2019 (jp)
May 13, 2019 Filing 4 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (jp)
April 24, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to Frank O. Lambertus re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 6/24/2019. (jp) (cc: L.A.)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER of Conditional Filing - (jd)
April 22, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Frank O. Lambertus.(jd) Modified on 4/23/2019 (jd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lambertus v. State of Idaho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Idaho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Frank O. Lambertus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?