Rinner v. Wasden et al
Plaintiff: Lora Lee Rinner
Defendant: Lawrence G Wasden, Bradley Little, Alex azar, David Malpass and Alex M Azar
Case Number: 1:2019cv00157
Filed: April 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Bastian
Referring Judge: Ronald E Bush
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: Plaintiff's In Forma Pauperis Application #1 is DENIED. Plaintiff's Complaint is dismissed, with prejudice. Signed by Judge Stanley A. Bastian. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
May 16, 2019 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change. This case has been reassigned to Judge Stanley A. Bastian. Please use case number 1:19-cv-00157-SAB on all future pleadings. (st)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DOCKET TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. This case is reassigned to Judge Stanley A. Bastian from the Eastern District of Washington for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
April 30, 2019 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change, Case reassigned to Judge B. Lynn Winmill for all further proceedings. Please use this case number on all future pleadings, 1:19-cv-157-BLW (jp)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER of Conditional Filing - (jd)
April 29, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Lora Lee Rinner.(jd) Modified on 4/30/2019 (jd).
April 29, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet re #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Lora Lee Rinner. (jd) Modified on 4/30/2019 (jd).
April 29, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Lora Lee Rinner. Responses due by 5/21/2019 (jd) Modified on 4/30/2019 (jd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rinner v. Wasden et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lora Lee Rinner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence G Wasden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradley Little
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex azar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Malpass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex M Azar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?