Ingham v. Enhanced Recovery Company, LLC
Plaintiff: Terry Ingham
Defendant: Enhanced Recovery Company, LLC and DIRECTV, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00161
Filed: May 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Bastian
Referring Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The Court accepts and enters the parties' Stipulation for Dismissal With Prejudice #11 . Plaintiff's claims asserted against Defendants are DISMISSED, with prejudice and without fees or costs to any party. Signed by Judge Stanley A. Bastian. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
June 5, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by DIRECTV, LLC, Enhanced Recovery Company, LLC. (Goodell, John)
May 16, 2019 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change. This case has been reassigned to Judge Stanley A Bastian. Please use case number 1:19-cv-00161-SAB on all future pleadings. (st)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. This case is reassigned to Judge Stanley A. Bastian from the Eastern District of Washington for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
May 15, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for DIRECTV, LLC, Enhanced Recovery Company, LLC, Terry Ingham re #6 Answer to Complaint, #5 Answer to Complaint, #1 Notice of Removal Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 7/15/2019. (km)
May 13, 2019 RETURN OF SERVICE/PROCESS ASSUMED EXECUTED (service assumed for internal reporting purpose only) (km)
May 13, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED DOCUMENT by DIRECTV, LLC. Amendment to #7 Corporate Disclosure Statement . (Goodell, John)
May 8, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DIRECTV, LLC. (Goodell, John)
May 8, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by DIRECTV, LLC.(Goodell, John)
May 8, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Enhanced Recovery Company, LLC.(Goodell, John)
May 2, 2019 Filing 4 Civil Cover Sheet re #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Enhanced Recovery Company, LLC, #1 Notice of Removal filed by Enhanced Recovery Company, LLC. (Goodell, John)
May 1, 2019 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet re #1 Notice of Removal filed by Enhanced Recovery Company, LLC. (Goodell, John)
May 1, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Enhanced Recovery Company, LLC. (Goodell, John)
May 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Enhanced Recovery Company, LLC from Canyon County District Court, case number CV14-19-2897.(Filing fee $400 receipt number0976-1882579.), filed by Enhanced Recovery Company, LLC.(Goodell, John) (Main Document 1 replaced on 5/15/2019) (km). (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/15/2019: #1 State Court Docket Sheet, #2 Summons Issued, #3 Complaint, #4 Summons Returned Executed) (km).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ingham v. Enhanced Recovery Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Ingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enhanced Recovery Company, LLC
Represented By: John R Goodell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DIRECTV, LLC
Represented By: John R Goodell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?