Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company v. The Haskins Company et al
Plaintiff: The Haskins Company, a Washington Corporation, SCAFCO Corporation, a Washington Corporation, Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company, an Iowa Corporation, a/s/o Lansing Trade Group, LLC and Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company
Defendant: SCAFCO Corporation and The Haskins Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00179
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Ronald E Bush
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company, SCAFCO Corporation, The Haskins Company re #6 Answer to Complaint, #1 Complaint, Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 9/10/2019. (jp)
July 10, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SCAFCO Corporation. (Pope, William)
July 10, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by SCAFCO Corporation.(Pope, William)
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company. SCAFCO Corporation served on 6/19/2019, answer due 7/10/2019. (Casey, Clinton)
June 18, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company. The Haskins Company waiver sent on 6/17/2019, answer due 8/16/2019. (Casey, Clinton)
June 5, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to SCAFCO Corporation, The Haskins Company. (Print attached Summonses for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons)(jp)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company, an Iowa Corporation, a/s/o Lansing Trade Group, LLC. (Casey, Clinton)
May 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1889847.), filed by Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company, an Iowa Corporation, a/s/o Lansing Trade Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Summons Summons - SCAFCO Corporation, #3 Summons Summons - Haskins Company, #4 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Casey, Clinton)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company v. The Haskins Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Haskins Company, a Washington Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SCAFCO Corporation, a Washington Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company, an Iowa Corporation, a/s/o Lansing Trade Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company
Represented By: Clinton O Casey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCAFCO Corporation
Represented By: William G Pope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Haskins Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?