Kissack v. Aramark Campus, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Brandi Kissack
Defendant: Aramark FHC Campus Services, LLC, Aramark Food & Supply Services Group, Inc., Aramark Campus, LLC and Aramark Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv00184
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Aramark Campus, LLC, Aramark Corporation, Aramark FHC Campus Services, LLC, Aramark Food & Supply Services Group, Inc., Brandi Kissack re #1 Complaint, #11 Answer to Complaint Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 8/12/2019. (alw)
June 11, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Aramark Campus, LLC, Aramark Corporation, Aramark FHC Campus Services, LLC, Aramark Food & Supply Services Group, Inc.. (Lee, Larissa)
June 11, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Aramark Campus, LLC, Aramark Corporation, Aramark FHC Campus Services, LLC, Aramark Food & Supply Services Group, Inc..(Lee, Larissa)
May 30, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brandi Kissack. Aramark Food & Supply Services Group, Inc. served on 5/29/2019, answer due 6/19/2019. (Williams, Daniel)
May 30, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brandi Kissack. Aramark FHC Campus Services, LLC served on 5/29/2019, answer due 6/19/2019. (Williams, Daniel)
May 30, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brandi Kissack. Aramark Corporation served on 5/29/2019, answer due 6/19/2019. (Williams, Daniel)
May 30, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brandi Kissack. Aramark Campus, LLC served on 5/29/2019, answer due 6/19/2019. (Williams, Daniel)
May 22, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(alw)
May 22, 2019 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - The entry docket number #5 Summons Returned Executed filed by Brandi Kissack, #4 Summons Returned Executed filed by Brandi Kissack, #3 Summons Returned Executed filed by Brandi Kissack, #2 Summons Returned Executed filed by Brandi Kissack was filed incorrectly in this case. The filing party shall re-submit their correct filing after the summons have been issued.(alw)
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 *DISREGARD* SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brandi Kissack. Aramark Food & Supply Services Group, Inc. served on 5/21/2019, answer due 6/11/2019. (Williams, Daniel) Modified on 5/22/2019 (alw).
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 *DISREGARD* SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brandi Kissack. Aramark FHC Campus Services, LLC served on 5/21/2019, answer due 6/11/2019. (Williams, Daniel) Modified on 5/22/2019 (alw).
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 *DISREGARD* SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brandi Kissack. Aramark Corporation served on 5/21/2019, answer due 6/11/2019. (Williams, Daniel) Modified on 5/22/2019 (alw).
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 *DISREGARD*SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brandi Kissack. Aramark Campus, LLC served on 5/21/2019, answer due 6/11/2019. (Williams, Daniel) Modified on 5/22/2019 (alw).
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against Aramark Campus, LLC, Aramark Corporation, Aramark FHC Campus Services, LLC, Aramark Food & Supply Services Group, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1890503.), filed by Brandi Kissack. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Aramark Campus, #3 Summons Aramark Corporation, #4 Summons Aramark FHC Campus Services, LLC, #5 Summons Aramark Food & Supply Services Group, Inc.)(Williams, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kissack v. Aramark Campus, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandi Kissack
Represented By: Daniel E Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aramark FHC Campus Services, LLC
Represented By: Larissa Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aramark Food & Supply Services Group, Inc.
Represented By: Larissa Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aramark Campus, LLC
Represented By: Larissa Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aramark Corporation
Represented By: Larissa Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?