Heeb et al v. Whipple Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Randal Heeb and Shirley Ann Merchant
Defendant: Virtual Design Concepts, LLC, Whipple Inc. and Jason Whipple
Case Number: 1:2019cv00190
Filed: May 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Filing 12 Counterdefendants ANSWER to #6 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Randal Heeb, Shirley Ann Merchant.(Anderson, Tyler)
July 16, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE by Virtual Design Concepts, LLC, Jason Whipple of Change of Firm Name (McGee, Matthew)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 8/1/2019 11:00 AM in Telephonic Hearing - Chambers before Judge B. Lynn Winmill. Case Management deadline for joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan set for 7/25/2019. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (alw)
July 2, 2019 Filing 10 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (alw)
June 25, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Randal Heeb, Shirley Ann Merchant, Virtual Design Concepts, LLC, Jason Whipple, Whipple Inc. re #6 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, #1 Complaint, Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 8/26/2019. (alw)
June 20, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Virtual Design Concepts, LLC, Jason Whipple, Whipple Inc.. (McGee, Matthew)
June 20, 2019 Filing 6 Defendants' ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Randal Heeb, Shirley Ann Merchant by Virtual Design Concepts, LLC, Whipple Inc., Jason Whipple.(McGee, Matthew)
June 5, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Randal Heeb, Shirley Ann Merchant. Virtual Design Concepts, LLC served on 5/30/2019, answer due 6/20/2019. (Anderson, Tyler)
June 5, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Randal Heeb, Shirley Ann Merchant. Whipple Inc. served on 5/30/2019, answer due 6/20/2019. (Anderson, Tyler)
June 5, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Randal Heeb, Shirley Ann Merchant. Jason Whipple served on 5/30/2019, answer due 6/20/2019. (Anderson, Tyler)
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(alw)
May 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against Virtual Design Concepts, LLC, Jason Whipple, Whipple Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1892453.), filed by Randal Heeb, Shirley Ann Merchant. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Cover Sheet)(Anderson, Tyler) Modified on 5/23/2019 to correct docket text at request of counsel (km).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heeb et al v. Whipple Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virtual Design Concepts, LLC
Represented By: Thomas Hethe Clark
Represented By: Matthew James McGee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whipple Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Hethe Clark
Represented By: Matthew James McGee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Whipple
Represented By: Thomas Hethe Clark
Represented By: Matthew James McGee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randal Heeb
Represented By: Tyler J Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Ann Merchant
Represented By: Tyler J Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?